US HB3062 | 2015-2016 | 114th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Introduced on July 14 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-12-08 - Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 669.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on July 14 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-12-08 - Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 669.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
APPROVAL Act Assuring Private Property Rights Over Vast Access to Land Act This bill amends the Energy Policy Act of 2005 to prohibit the Secretary of Energy and the Administrators of the Western Area Power Administration and of the Southwestern Power Administration from using the power of eminent domain to implement modernization of electricity transmission infrastructure, unless they have received explicit permission to do so by: (1) the state governor and the head of each applicable public utility commission or public service commission of the affected state, and (2) the head of the governing body of each Indian tribe whose land would be affected. An electricity transmission infrastructure project, to the greatest extent practicable, must be sited upon either an existing federal right-of-way or upon federal land managed by either: (1) the Bureau of Land Management, (2) the Forest Service, (3) the Bureau of Reclamation, or (4) the Corps of Engineers.
Title
APPROVAL Act Assuring Private Property Rights Over Vast Access to Land Act
Sponsors
Rep. Steve Womack [R-AR] | Rep. French Hill [R-AR] | Rep. Eric Crawford [R-AR] | Rep. Bruce Westerman [R-AR] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-12-08 | House | Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 669. |
2016-12-08 | House | Committee on Energy and Commerce discharged. |
2016-12-08 | House | Referred sequentially to the House Committee on Energy and Commerce for a period ending not later than Dec. 8, 2016 for consideration of such provisions of the bill as fall within the jurisdiction of that committee pursuant to clause 1(f) of rule X.. |
2016-12-08 | House | Reported by the Committee on 114-856, Part I. |
2015-07-14 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Natural Resources. |
2015-07-14 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SB485 (Same As) 2015-05-14 - Committee on Energy and Natural Resources. Hearings held.
Subjects
Electric power generation and transmission
Energy
Federal-Indian relations
Intergovernmental relations
Land transfers
Land use and conservation
State and local government operations
Energy
Federal-Indian relations
Intergovernmental relations
Land transfers
Land use and conservation
State and local government operations