US HB306 | 2017-2018 | 115th Congress

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on January 11 2017 - 50% progression
Action: 2017-01-11 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Energy and Natural Resources.
Pending: Senate Energy And Natural Resources Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Energy Efficient Government Technology Act (Sec. 2) This bill amends the Energy Independence and Security Act of 2007 by requiring each federal agency to coordinate with the Office of Management and Budget (OMB), the Department of Energy (DOE), and the Environmental Protection Agency to develop an implementation strategy for the maintenance, purchase, and use by the agency of energy-efficient and energy-saving information technologies. The OMB must establish performance goals for evaluating the efforts of agencies in improving the maintenance, purchase, and use of the technology. The executive branch's Chief Information Officers Council must recommend best practices for attaining the performance goals, including consideration of the use of energy savings performance and utility energy services contracting. Agencies must include in their annual government efficiency status reports a description of those energy-saving efforts and their results, and the OMB must begin to include in its annual government efficiency report a description of agencies' efforts and results. (Sec. 3) DOE must make available to the public an update to the Report to Congress on Server and Data Center Energy Efficiency published on August 2, 2007, that includes evaluations of: (1) the impact of the combination of cloud platforms, mobile devices, social media, and big data on data center energy usage; and (2) water usage in data centers. In collaboration with key stakeholders and the OMB, DOE must also: (1) maintain a data center energy practitioner program that leads to the certification of energy practitioners qualified to evaluate the energy usage and efficiency opportunities in federal data centers; and (2) establish an open data initiative to make information about federal data center energy usage available and accessible while encouraging data center innovation, optimization, and consolidation. In collaboration with key stakeholders, DOE must: (1) participate in efforts to harmonize global specifications and metrics for data center energy and water efficiency, and (2) facilitate the development of a metric for data center energy efficiency.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Energy Efficient Government Technology Act

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2017-01-11SenateReceived in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Energy and Natural Resources.
2017-01-10HouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
2017-01-10HouseOn motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H266-267)
2017-01-10HouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 306.
2017-01-10HouseConsidered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H266-268)
2017-01-10HouseMr. Olson moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill.
2017-01-05HouseReferred to the House Committee on Energy and Commerce.
2017-01-05HouseIntroduced in House

Subjects


US Congress State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback