US HB3053 | 2011-2012 | 112th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 42-0)
Status: Introduced on September 23 2011 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-10-25 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Military Personnel.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Military Personnel Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on September 23 2011 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-10-25 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Military Personnel.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Military Personnel Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Repeal Existing Policies that Encourage and Allow Legal HIV Discrimination Act, the REPEAL HIV Discrimination Act, or the REPEAL Act - Expresses the sense of Congress that federal and state laws, policies, and regulations regarding people living with HIV/AIDS should: (1) not place unique or additional burdens on such individuals solely as a result of their HIV status; and (2) demonstrate a public health-oriented, evidence-based, medically accurate, and contemporary understanding of HIV transmission, health implications, treatment, and the impact of punitive HIV-specific laws and policies on affected people, families, and communities. Directs: (1) the Attorney General (AG), Secretary of Health and Human Services (HHS), and Secretary of Defense (DOD) to initiate a national review of federal (including military) and state laws, policies, regulations, and judicial precedents and decisions regarding criminal and related civil commitment cases involving people living with HIV/AIDS; and (2) the AG to transmit to Congress and make publicly available the results of such review with related recommendations. Requires the AG and HHS Secretary to: (1) develop and publicly release guidance and best practice recommendations for states, and (2) establish an integrated monitoring and evaluation system to measure state progress. Directs the AG and HHS and DOD Secretaries to transmit to the President and Congress any proposals necessary to implement adjustments to federal laws, policies, or regulations. Authorizes grants to eligible state and local entities, nongovernmental organizations, and public health departments to incorporate best practice recommendations within state laws, policies, regulations, and judicial decisions. Requires that such entities, departments, or organizations agree to abide with the sense of Congress statements set forth above as a condition of receiving such assistance.
Title
REPEAL Act
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-10-25 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Military Personnel. |
2011-10-12 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on the Constitution. |
2011-09-26 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Health. |
2011-09-23 | House | Referred to House Armed Services |
2011-09-23 | House | Referred to House Energy and Commerce |
2011-09-23 | House | Referred to House Judiciary |
2011-09-23 | House | Referred to the Committee on the Judiciary, and in addition to the Committees on Energy and Commerce, and Armed Services, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
Subjects
Civil rights and liberties, minority issues
Criminal procedure and sentencing
Disability and health-based discrimination
Government studies and investigations
Health programs administration and funding
HIV/AIDS
Military law
State and local government operations
Criminal procedure and sentencing
Disability and health-based discrimination
Government studies and investigations
Health programs administration and funding
HIV/AIDS
Military law
State and local government operations
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/112th-congress/house-bill/3053/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/112/bills/hr3053/BILLS-112hr3053ih.pdf |