US HB3036 | 2017-2018 | 115th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 27-13)
Status: Introduced on June 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-07-17 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Military Personnel.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Military Personnel Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on June 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-07-17 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Military Personnel.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Military Personnel Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
DD-214 Modernization Act This bill directs the Department of Defense to modify the Certificate of Release or Discharge from Active Duty (DD Form 214) to include a specific block explicitly identified as the location in which a member of the Armed Forces may provide an email address by which the member may be contacted after discharge or release from active duty.
Title
DD-214 Modernization Act
Sponsors
Roll Calls
Senate - On the Cloture Motion S.Amdt. 1003 to H.R. 2810 (National Defense Authorization Act for Fiscal Year 2018) (Y: 84 N: 9 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
Senate - On Cloture on the Motion to Proceed H.R. 2810 (Y: 89 N: 3 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
Senate - On Cloture on the Motion to Proceed H.R. 2810 (Y: 89 N: 3 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-07-17 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Military Personnel. |
2017-06-23 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Armed Services. |
2017-06-23 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
HB2810 (Related) 2017-12-12 - Became Public Law No: 115-91. (TXT | PDF)
HR616 (Similar To) 2017-11-14 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
HR616 (Similar To) 2017-11-14 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
Subjects
Armed forces and national security
Government information and archives
Military personnel and dependents
Personnel records
Government information and archives
Military personnel and dependents
Personnel records