US HB3035 | 2017-2018 | 115th Congress

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on June 23 2017 - 25% progression
Action: 2017-06-23 - Referred to the House Committee on Ways and Means.
Pending: House Ways And Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Philanthropic Enterprise Act of 2017 This bill amends the Internal Revenue Code to exempt the holdings of a private foundation in any business enterprise that meets specified requirements relating to exclusive ownership, minimum distribution of net operating income for the charitable purpose (all profits to charity distribution requirement), and independent operation (not controlled by a substantial contributor or family members) from the excise taxes on excess business holdings.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Philanthropic Enterprise Act of 2017

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2017-06-23HouseReferred to the House Committee on Ways and Means.
2017-06-23HouseIntroduced in House

Same As/Similar To

SB1343 (Related) 2017-06-13 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
HB1 (Related) 2017-12-22 - Became Public Law No: 115-97. (TXT | PDF)
HR619 (Similar To) 2017-11-15 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
SB1 (Related) 2017-11-28 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 269.

Subjects


US Congress State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback