US HB303 | 2013-2014 | 113th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 15 2013 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-02-04 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Disability Assistance and Memorial Affairs.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Disability Assistance and Memorial Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 15 2013 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-02-04 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Disability Assistance and Memorial Affairs.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Disability Assistance and Memorial Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Retired Pay Restoration Act - Expresses the sense of Congress that military retired pay should not be reduced because a military retiree is also eligible for veterans' disability compensation awarded for a service-connected disability. Allows the receipt of both military retired pay and veterans' disability compensation with respect to any service-connected disability (under current law, only a disability rated at 50% or more). Repeals provisions phasing in the full concurrent receipt of such pay through December 31, 2013. Makes eligible for the full concurrent receipt of both veterans' disability compensation and either military retired pay or combat-related special pay those individuals who were retired or separated from military service due to a service-connected disability.
Title
Retired Pay Restoration Act
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-02-04 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Disability Assistance and Memorial Affairs. |
2013-01-31 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Military Personnel. |
2013-01-15 | House | Referred to House Veterans' Affairs |
2013-01-15 | House | Referred to House Armed Services |
2013-01-15 | House | Referred to the Committee on Armed Services, and in addition to the Committee on Veterans' Affairs, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
Same As/Similar To
HB333 (Related) 2013-02-04 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Disability Assistance and Memorial Affairs.
SB234 (Related) 2013-02-07 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Armed Services. (text of measure as introduced: CR S521-522)
SB234 (Related) 2013-02-07 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Armed Services. (text of measure as introduced: CR S521-522)
Subjects
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/113th-congress/house-bill/303/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/113/bills/hr303/BILLS-113hr303ih.pdf |