US HB302 | 2009-2010 | 111th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-8)
Status: Introduced on January 8 2009 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2009-01-08 - Referred to the House Committee on Financial Services.
Pending: House Financial Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 8 2009 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2009-01-08 - Referred to the House Committee on Financial Services.
Pending: House Financial Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Directs the Securities and Exchange Commission (SEC) to: (1) reinstate rule 10a-1 (the uptick rule) governing short sales of securities; (2) rescind the prohibition against applying certain price tests to short sales; and (3) reinstate price test restrictions that applied to short sales of securities prior to SEC action in a specified proceeding on June 28, 2007.
Title
To require the Securities and Exchange Commission to reinstate the uptick rule on short sales of securities.
Sponsors
Rep. Gary Ackerman [D-NY] | Rep. Rick Boucher [D-VA] | Rep. Paul Broun [R-GA] | Rep. Michael Capuano [D-MA] |
Rep. Joe Courtney [D-CT] | Rep. Nathan Deal [R-GA] | Rep. Lynn Jenkins [R-KS] | Rep. Jack Kingston [R-GA] |
Sen. Mark Kirk [R-IL] | Rep. Ron Klein [D-FL] | Rep. Christopher Lee [R-NY] | Rep. Nita Lowey [D-NY] |
Rep. Carolyn Maloney [D-NY] | Rep. Carolyn McCarthy [D-NY] | Rep. Ed Perlmutter [D-CO] | Sen. Gary Peters [D-MI] |
Rep. David Scott [D-GA] | Rep. Lee Terry [R-NE] | Rep. Mike Thompson [D-CA] | Rep. Anthony Weiner [D-NY] |
Rep. Lynn Westmoreland [R-GA] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-01-08 | Referred to the House Committee on Financial Services. |
Same As/Similar To
HB1406 (Related) 2009-03-10 - Referred to the House Committee on Financial Services.
SB605 (Related) 2009-03-19 - Sponsor introductory remarks on measure. (CR S3636-3539)
SB605 (Related) 2009-03-19 - Sponsor introductory remarks on measure. (CR S3636-3539)
Subjects
Administrative law and regulatory procedures
Finance and financial sector
Financial services and investments
Securities
Securities and Exchange Commission (SEC)
Finance and financial sector
Financial services and investments
Securities
Securities and Exchange Commission (SEC)
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/111th-congress/house-bill/302/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/111/bills/hr302/BILLS-111hr302ih.pdf |