US HB2994 | 2017-2018 | 115th Congress

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 12-2)
Status: Introduced on June 21 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-07-17 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Seapower and Projection Forces.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Seapower and Projection Forces Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

SHIPS Act Securing the Homeland by Increasing our Power on the Seas Act This bill declares that it shall be the policy of the United States to have available, as soon as practicable, at least 355 battle force ships, comprised of the optimal mix of platforms, with funding subject to the annual authorization and appropriation of funds.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

SHIPS Act Securing the Homeland by Increasing our Power on the Seas Act

Sponsors


Roll Calls


History

DateChamberAction
2017-07-17HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Seapower and Projection Forces.
2017-06-21HouseReferred to the House Committee on Armed Services.
2017-06-21HouseIntroduced in House

Same As/Similar To

SB1414 (Same As) 2017-06-22 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Armed Services.
HB2810 (Related) 2017-12-12 - Became Public Law No: 115-91. (TXT | PDF)
HR616 (Similar To) 2017-11-14 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.

Subjects


US Congress State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback