US HB2990 | 2023-2024 | 118th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on April 28 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-10-25 - Subcommittee Hearings Held
Pending: House Water, Wildlife, and Fisheries Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on April 28 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-10-25 - Subcommittee Hearings Held
Pending: House Water, Wildlife, and Fisheries Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
To amend the National Defense Authorization Act for Fiscal Year 2017 to address sexual harassment involving National Oceanic and Atmospheric Administration personnel, and for other purposes.
Title
National Oceanic and Atmospheric Administration Sexual Harassment and Assault Prevention Improvements Act of 2023
Sponsors
Rep. Suzanne Bonamici [D-OR] | Rep. Jenniffer Gonzalez-Colon [R-PR] | Rep. Jared Huffman [D-CA] | Rep. Maria Salazar [R-FL] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-10-25 | House | Subcommittee Hearings Held |
2023-05-22 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Water, Wildlife, and Fisheries. |
2023-05-01 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Water Resources and Environment. |
2023-04-28 | House | Referred to the Committee on Natural Resources, and in addition to the Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2023-04-28 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
HB8862 (Related) 2024-08-01 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Conservation, Research, and Biotechnology.
Subjects
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/118th-congress/house-bill/2990/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/118/bills/hr2990/BILLS-118hr2990ih.pdf |