US HB299 | 2017-2018 | 115th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on June 26 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-08-01 - Committee on Veterans' Affairs. Hearings held.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on June 26 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-08-01 - Committee on Veterans' Affairs. Hearings held.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Blue Water Navy Vietnam Veterans Act of 2017 This bill extends the presumption of service connection for certain diseases associated with herbicide exposure to veterans who served: (1) in the territorial seas of Vietnam between January 9, 1962, and May 7, 1975, or (2) in or near the Korean demilitarized zone between September 1, 1967, and August 31, 1971. Under a presumption of service-connection, specific disabilities diagnosed in certain veterans are presumed to have been caused by the circumstances of their military service. Health care benefits and disability compensation may then be awarded. The bill extends eligibility for health care, vocational training and rehabilitation, and monetary allowance to children with spina bifida who have at least one veteran parent who may have been exposed to an herbicide agent while serving in Thailand between January 9, 1962, and May 7, 1975. The bill revises the VA's home loan guaranty program to adjust loan fee rates and eliminate the limit on guaranty amount that is based on the Federal Home Loan Mortgage Corporation (Freddie Mac) conforming loan limit. The VA shall permit a VA-approved appraiser to make a housing loan appraisal based solely on information gathered by a person with whom the appraiser has entered into an agreement for such services.
Title
Blue Water Navy Vietnam Veterans Act of 2017
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-06-25 - House - On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended RC# 289 (Y: 382 N: 0 NV: 45 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-08-01 | Senate | Committee on Veterans' Affairs. Hearings held. |
2018-06-28 | Senate | Read twice and referred to the Committee on Veterans' Affairs. |
2018-06-26 | Senate | Received in the Senate. |
2018-06-25 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2018-06-25 | House | On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 382 - 0 (Roll no. 289). (text: CR H5611-5614) |
2018-06-25 | House | Considered as unfinished business. (consideration: CR H5620-5621) |
2018-06-25 | House | At the conclusion of debate, the Yeas and Nays were demanded and ordered. Pursuant to the provisions of clause 8, rule XX, the Chair announced that further proceedings on the motion would be postponed. |
2018-06-25 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 299. |
2018-06-25 | House | Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H5611-5620) |
2018-06-25 | House | Mr. Roe (TN) moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended. |
2018-05-18 | House | Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 523. |
2018-05-18 | House | Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Veterans' Affairs. H. Rept. 115-680. |
2018-05-08 | House | Ordered to be Reported (Amended) by Voice Vote. |
2018-05-08 | House | Subcommittee on Disability Assistance and Memorial Affairs Discharged. |
2018-05-08 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2017-11-02 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2017-04-05 | House | Subcommittee Hearings Held. |
2017-01-19 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Disability Assistance and Memorial Affairs. |
2017-01-05 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Veterans' Affairs. |
2017-01-05 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SB422 (Same As) 2017-02-16 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Veterans' Affairs.
HB815 (Related) 2017-10-25 - Forwarded by Subcommittee to Full Committee by Voice Vote .
HB3561 (Related) 2017-10-12 - Ordered to be Reported in the Nature of a Substitute by Voice Vote.
HB3605 (Related) 2017-07-28 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Disability Assistance and Memorial Affairs.
SB3175 (Related) 2018-06-28 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Veterans' Affairs.
HB815 (Related) 2017-10-25 - Forwarded by Subcommittee to Full Committee by Voice Vote .
HB3561 (Related) 2017-10-12 - Ordered to be Reported in the Nature of a Substitute by Voice Vote.
HB3605 (Related) 2017-07-28 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Disability Assistance and Memorial Affairs.
SB3175 (Related) 2018-06-28 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Veterans' Affairs.
Subjects
Armed forces and national security
Asia
Birth defects
Cancer
Cardiovascular and respiratory health
Child health
Conflicts and wars
Digestive and metabolic diseases
Disability and paralysis
Government lending and loan guarantees
Hazardous wastes and toxic substances
Housing finance and home ownership
Musculoskeletal and skin diseases
South Korea
Thailand
Veterans' education, employment, rehabilitation
Veterans' loans, housing, homeless programs
Veterans' medical care
Veterans' pensions and compensation
Vietnam
Asia
Birth defects
Cancer
Cardiovascular and respiratory health
Child health
Conflicts and wars
Digestive and metabolic diseases
Disability and paralysis
Government lending and loan guarantees
Hazardous wastes and toxic substances
Housing finance and home ownership
Musculoskeletal and skin diseases
South Korea
Thailand
Veterans' education, employment, rehabilitation
Veterans' loans, housing, homeless programs
Veterans' medical care
Veterans' pensions and compensation
Vietnam