US HB299 | 2015-2016 | 114th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on April 14 2015 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-04-14 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Banking, Housing, and Urban Affairs.
Pending: Senate Banking, Housing, And Urban Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 14 2015 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-04-14 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Banking, Housing, and Urban Affairs.
Pending: Senate Banking, Housing, And Urban Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Capital Access for Small Community Financial Institutions Act of 2015 (Sec. 2) Amends the Federal Home Loan Bank Act to treat certain privately insured credit unions as insured depository institutions for purposes of determining eligibility for membership in a federal home loan bank. Permits a credit union which lacks federal deposit insurance and has applied for membership in a federal home loan bank to be treated as meeting all the eligibility requirements for federal deposit insurance if the supervisor of the chartering state has determined that it meets all federal deposit insurance eligibility requirements. Deems such a credit union to have met the eligibility criteria for federal home loan bank membership if, six months after its application date, the state supervisor has failed to act upon the application. Prohibits the application of a state law authorizing a conservator or liquidating agent of a credit union to repudiate contracts to any: (1) extension of credit from a federal home loan bank to a credit union which is a member of that bank, or (2) security interest in the assets of the credit union securing such extension of credit. Declares that if a federal home loan bank makes an advance to a state-chartered credit union that is not federally insured: (i) the bank's interest in any collateral securing such advance has the same priority and is afforded the same standing and rights that the security interest would have had if the advance had been made to a federally-insured credit union, and (2) the bank has the same right to access such collateral that it would have had if the advance had been made to a federally-insured credit union. Amends the Federal Deposit Insurance Act to require private deposit insurers of credit unions that are members of a federal home loan bank to submit copies of their audit reports within seven days to the Federal Housing Finance Agency. (Sec. 3) Directs the Government Accountability Office to study: (1) the adequacy of insurance reserves held by a private deposit insurer that insures deposits in an insured credit union or any credit union eligible to apply to become one, and (2) such credit unions' compliance with federal regulations governing disclosure of a lack of federal deposit insurance.
Title
Capital Access for Small Community Financial Institutions Act of 2015
Sponsors
Rep. Steve Stivers [R-OH] | Rep. Joyce Beatty [D-OH] | Rep. Patrick Tiberi [R-OH] | Rep. Andre Carson [D-IN] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-04-14 | Senate | Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Banking, Housing, and Urban Affairs. |
2015-04-13 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2015-04-13 | House | On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H2119) |
2015-04-13 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 299. |
2015-04-13 | House | Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H2119-2120) |
2015-04-13 | House | Mr. Neugebauer moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill. |
2015-04-13 | House | Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 39. |
2015-04-13 | House | Reported by the Committee on Financial Services. H. Rept. 114-58. |
2015-03-26 | House | Ordered to be Reported by the Yeas and Nays: 56 - 1. |
2015-03-26 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2015-03-25 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2015-01-13 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Financial Services. |
2015-01-13 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SB1484 (Related) 2015-07-23 - Committee on Banking, Housing, and Urban Affairs. Hearings held.
HB2642 (Related) 2015-06-03 - Referred to the House Committee on Financial Services.
SB1491 (Related) 2015-10-28 - Committee on Banking, Housing, and Urban Affairs Subcommittee on Financial Institutions and Consumer Protection. Hearings held.
SB1910 (Related) 2015-07-30 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 176.
SB1367 (Related) 2015-05-18 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Banking, Housing, and Urban Affairs.
HB22 (Related) 2015-12-04 - Became Public Law No: 114-94. (TXT | PDF)
SB2132 (Related) 2015-10-06 - Read the second time. Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 251.
HB2642 (Related) 2015-06-03 - Referred to the House Committee on Financial Services.
SB1491 (Related) 2015-10-28 - Committee on Banking, Housing, and Urban Affairs Subcommittee on Financial Institutions and Consumer Protection. Hearings held.
SB1910 (Related) 2015-07-30 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 176.
SB1367 (Related) 2015-05-18 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Banking, Housing, and Urban Affairs.
HB22 (Related) 2015-12-04 - Became Public Law No: 114-94. (TXT | PDF)
SB2132 (Related) 2015-10-06 - Read the second time. Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 251.
Subjects
Accounting and auditing
Bank accounts, deposits, capital
Banking and financial institutions regulation
Business records
Congressional oversight
Finance and financial sector
Government studies and investigations
Housing finance and home ownership
Bank accounts, deposits, capital
Banking and financial institutions regulation
Business records
Congressional oversight
Finance and financial sector
Government studies and investigations
Housing finance and home ownership