US HB2976 | 2017-2018 | 115th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 56-17)
Status: Introduced on June 21 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-06-21 - Referred to the House Committee on Education and the Workforce.
Pending: House Education And The Workforce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on June 21 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-06-21 - Referred to the House Committee on Education and the Workforce.
Pending: House Education And The Workforce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Deferment for Active Cancer Treatment Act of 2017
Title
Deferment for Active Cancer Treatment Act of 2017
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-06-21 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Education and the Workforce. |
2017-06-21 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
HB4597 (Related) 2017-12-07 - Referred to the House Committee on Education and the Workforce.
SB3207 (Related) 2018-07-12 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions.
HB6470 (Related) 2018-07-23 - Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 667.
HB6157 (Related) 2018-09-28 - Became Public Law No: 115-245.
SB3207 (Related) 2018-07-12 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions.
HB6470 (Related) 2018-07-23 - Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 667.
HB6157 (Related) 2018-09-28 - Became Public Law No: 115-245.
Subjects
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/115th-congress/house-bill/2976/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/115/bills/hr2976/BILLS-115hr2976ih.pdf |