US HB2971 | 2023-2024 | 118th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Introduced on April 27 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-07-10 - Subcommittee Hearings Held
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on April 27 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-07-10 - Subcommittee Hearings Held
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
To amend title 38, United States Code, to promote assistance from persons recognized by the Secretary of Veterans Affairs for individuals who file certain claims under laws administered by the Secretary.
Title
Veterans Claims Education Act of 2023
Sponsors
Rep. Scott Peters [D-CA] | Rep. Brad Finstad [R-MN] | Rep. Morgan McGarvey [D-KY] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-07-10 | House | Subcommittee Hearings Held |
2023-09-11 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Disability Assistance and Memorial Affairs. |
2023-05-12 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Economic Opportunity. |
2023-04-27 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Veterans' Affairs. |
2023-04-27 | House | Introduced in House |
Subjects
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/118th-congress/house-bill/2971/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/118/bills/hr2971/BILLS-118hr2971ih.pdf |