US HB2969 | 2011-2012 | 112th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 83-44-1)
Status: Introduced on September 20 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-09-26 - Referred for a period ending not later than September 26, 2011, (or for a later time if the Chairman so designates) to the Subcommittee on Health, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the subcommittee concerned.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on September 20 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-09-26 - Referred for a period ending not later than September 26, 2011, (or for a later time if the Chairman so designates) to the Subcommittee on Health, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the subcommittee concerned.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Comprehensive Immunosuppressive Drug Coverage for Kidney Transplant Patients Act of 2011 - Amends title II (Old Age, Survivors and Disability Benefits) (OASDI) of the Social Security Act (SSA) to extend the months of coverage of immunosuppressive drugs for kidney transplant patients. Amends SSA title XVIII (Medicare) to make eligible for enrollment in Medicare part B (Supplementary Medical Insurance), solely for the purpose of such drug coverage, every individual whose insurance benefits under Medicare part A (Hospital Insurance) have ended by reason of a kidney transplant or the end of any requirement for a regular course of dialysis. Directs the Secretary of Health and Human Services (HHS) to determine a monthly premium rate for such individuals equal to 35% of the monthly actuarial rate for enrollees age 65 and over. Prescribes a formula for detemination of a government contribution to such a premium.
Title
Comprehensive Immunosuppressive Drug Coverage for Kidney Transplant Patients Act of 2011
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-09-26 | House | Referred for a period ending not later than September 26, 2011, (or for a later time if the Chairman so designates) to the Subcommittee on Health, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the subcommittee concerned. |
2011-09-26 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Health. |
2011-09-20 | House | Referred to House Ways and Means |
2011-09-20 | House | Referred to House Energy and Commerce |
2011-09-20 | House | Referred to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, and in addition to the Committee on Ways and Means, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
Same As/Similar To
SB1454 (Same As) 2011-07-29 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance. (text of measure as introduced: CR S5076-5077)
Subjects
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/112th-congress/house-bill/2969/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/112/bills/hr2969/BILLS-112hr2969ih.pdf |