US HB2939 | 2017-2018 | 115th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 13-0)
Status: Introduced on June 20 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-07-25 - Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 187.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on June 20 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-07-25 - Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 187.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Water Rights Protection Act of 2017 (Sec. 3) This bill prohibits the Departments of the Interior and Agriculture from: conditioning the issuance, renewal, amendment, or extension of any permit, approval, license, lease, allotment, easement, right-of-way, or other land use or occupancy agreement (permit) on the transfer of any water right to the United States or on any impairment of title or interest granted or otherwise recognized under state law by federal or state action; or requiring any water user (including a federally recognized Indian tribe) to apply for or acquire a water right in the name of the United States under state law as a condition of the issuance, renewal, amendment, or extension of such a permit. (Sec. 4) In developing any rule or similar federal action relating to the issuance, renewal, amendment, or extension of any permit, such departments: (1) shall recognize the longstanding water use authority of the states and coordinate with the states to ensure that any federal action is consistent with applicable state water law; and (2) shall not adversely affect the authority of a state in permitting the beneficial use of water or adjudicating water rights.
Title
Water Rights Protection Act of 2017
Sponsors
Rep. Scott Tipton [R-CO] | Rep. Doug Lamborn [R-CO] | Rep. Tom McClintock [R-CA] | Rep. Paul Gosar [R-AZ] |
Rep. Mark Amodei [R-NV] | Rep. Mia Love [R-UT] | Rep. David Schweikert [R-AZ] | Rep. Doug LaMalfa [R-CA] |
Rep. Michael Simpson [R-ID] | Rep. Bruce Westerman [R-AR] | Rep. Raul Labrador [R-ID] | Rep. Stevan Pearce [R-NM] |
Rep. Ken Buck [R-CO] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-07-25 | House | Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 187. |
2017-07-25 | House | Committee on Agriculture discharged. |
2017-07-25 | House | Reported by the Committee on Natural Resources. H. Rept. 115-257, Part I. |
2017-06-27 | House | Ordered to be Reported by the Yeas and Nays: 24 - 14. |
2017-06-27 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2017-06-26 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Conservation and Forestry. |
2017-06-20 | House | Referred to the Committee on Natural Resources, and in addition to the Committee on Agriculture, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2017-06-20 | House | Referred to the Committee on Natural Resources, and in addition to the Committee on Agriculture, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2017-06-20 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SB1230 (Related) 2017-07-26 - Committee on Energy and Natural Resources Subcommittee on Public Lands, Forests, and Mining. Hearings held.
Subjects
Administrative law and regulatory procedures
Department of Agriculture
Department of the Interior
Indian lands and resources rights
Intergovernmental relations
Land use and conservation
Licensing and registrations
Public lands and natural resources
State and local government operations
Water use and supply
Department of Agriculture
Department of the Interior
Indian lands and resources rights
Intergovernmental relations
Land use and conservation
Licensing and registrations
Public lands and natural resources
State and local government operations
Water use and supply