US HB2928 | 2017-2018 | 115th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on June 15 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-06-16 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Aviation.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Aviation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on June 15 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-06-16 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Aviation.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Aviation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
To direct the Secretary of Transportation to issue regulations to require air carriers to disclose to consumers the actual wheels-off and wheels-on times for certain domestic passenger flight segments, and for other purposes. This bill directs the Department of Transportation to modify federal consumer disclosure regulations to ensure that a reporting carrier: (1) discloses, upon the reasonable request of a consumer during the course of a reservation or ticketing discussion, the projected period between the actual wheels-off and wheels-on times for a reportable flight; and (2) displays on its public website information on such times for the most recent calendar month for a reportable flight. A "reporting carrier" is an air carrier that accounts for at least 1% of domestic scheduled-passenger revenues in the most recently reported 12-month period. A "reportable flight" is a nonstop flight to or from any airport within the 48 states that accounts for 1% of domestic scheduled-passenger enplanements in the previous calendar year.
Title
To direct the Secretary of Transportation to issue regulations to require air carriers to disclose to consumers the actual wheels-off and wheels-on times for certain domestic passenger flight segments, and for other purposes.
Sponsors
Rep. Donald Payne [D-NJ] | Rep. Albio Sires [D-NJ] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-06-16 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Aviation. |
2017-06-15 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure. |
2017-06-15 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
HB2997 (Related) 2017-09-06 - Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 213.
HB4 (Related) 2018-05-08 - Read the second time. Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 401.
HB302 (Related) 2018-10-05 - Became Public Law No: 115-254.
HB4 (Related) 2018-05-08 - Read the second time. Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 401.
HB302 (Related) 2018-10-05 - Became Public Law No: 115-254.
Subjects
Administrative law and regulatory procedures
Aviation and airports
Consumer affairs
Department of Transportation
Transportation and public works
Aviation and airports
Consumer affairs
Department of Transportation
Transportation and public works
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/115th-congress/house-bill/2928/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/115/bills/hr2928/BILLS-115hr2928ih.pdf |