US HB2917 | 2009-2010 | 111th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on June 17 2009 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2009-06-17 - Referred to the House Committee on Ways and Means.
Pending: House Ways And Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on June 17 2009 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2009-06-17 - Referred to the House Committee on Ways and Means.
Pending: House Ways And Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Amends the Internal Revenue Code to deny a tax deduction for advertising and related expenses to promote the sale or use of any prescription drug.
Title
To amend the Internal Revenue Code of 1986 to deny any deduction for advertising prescription drugs.
Sponsors
Rep. Daniel Lipinski [D-IL] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-06-17 | Referred to the House Committee on Ways and Means. |
Same As/Similar To
HB2966 (Related) 2009-06-19 - Referred to the House Committee on Ways and Means.
HB3979 (Related) 2009-11-02 - Referred to the House Committee on Ways and Means.
SB1763 (Related) 2009-10-08 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
HB3979 (Related) 2009-11-02 - Referred to the House Committee on Ways and Means.
SB1763 (Related) 2009-10-08 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
Subjects
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/111th-congress/house-bill/2917/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/111/bills/hr2917/BILLS-111hr2917ih.pdf |