US HB2912 | 2015-2016 | 114th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 33-0)
Status: Introduced on June 25 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-11-16 - Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 252.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on June 25 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-11-16 - Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 252.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Centennial Monetary Commission Act of 2015 (Sec. 3) This bill establishes the Centennial Monetary Commission to: (1) examine how U.S. monetary policy since the creation of the Federal Reserve Board in 1913 has affected the performance of the U.S. economy in terms of output, employment, prices, and financial stability over time; (2) evaluate various operational regimes under which the Board and the Federal Open Market Committee may conduct monetary policy in terms achieving the maximum sustainable level of output and employment and price stability over the long term; (3) evaluate the use of macro-prudential supervision and regulation and of the lender-of-last-resort function of the Board as tools of monetary policy in terms of achieving the maximum sustainable level of output and employment and price stability over the long term; and (4) recommend a course for U.S. monetary policy going forward. The Commission shall submit to Congress and make publicly available, by December 1, 2016, a report containing a statement of its findings and conclusions. (Sec. 8) The Commission shall terminate on June 1, 2017.
Title
Centennial Monetary Commission Act of 2015
Sponsors
Rep. Kevin Brady [R-TX] | Rep. Walter Jones [R-NC] | Sen. Markwayne Mullin [R-OK] | Rep. Rod Blum [R-IA] |
Rep. Tom McClintock [R-CA] | Rep. Michael Burgess [R-TX] | Rep. Raul Labrador [R-ID] | Rep. Blake Farenthold [R-TX] |
Rep. Stevan Pearce [R-NM] | Rep. Lamar Smith [R-TX] | Rep. Mick Mulvaney [R-SC] | Rep. Jim Jordan [R-OH] |
Rep. David Joyce [R-OH] | Rep. Keith Rothfus [R-PA] | Rep. Jeff Duncan [R-SC] | Rep. Bill Flores [R-TX] |
Rep. Lynn Jenkins [R-KS] | Rep. Randy Neugebauer [R-TX] | Sen. Cynthia Lummis [R-WY] | Rep. Michael McCaul [R-TX] |
Rep. Louie Gohmert [R-TX] | Rep. James Renacci [R-OH] | Rep. Randy Weber [R-TX] | Sen. Kevin Cramer [R-ND] |
Rep. Jim Bridenstine [R-OK] | Rep. Kay Granger [R-TX] | Rep. Virginia Foxx [R-NC] | Rep. Sam Johnson [R-TX] |
Rep. Todd Rokita [R-IN] | Rep. Pete Olson [R-TX] | Rep. Dave Brat [R-VA] | Rep. Steve Russell [R-OK] |
Rep. Austin Scott [R-GA] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-11-16 | House | Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 252. |
2015-11-16 | House | Reported by the Committee on Financial Services. H. Rept. 114-331. |
2015-07-29 | House | Ordered to be Reported by the Yeas and Nays: 35 - 22. |
2015-07-29 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2015-07-22 | House | Hearings Held by the Subcommittee on Monetary Policy and Trade Prior to Referral. |
2015-06-25 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Financial Services. |
2015-06-25 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SB1786 (Same As) 2015-07-16 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Banking, Housing, and Urban Affairs. (text of measure as introduced: CR S5172-5173)
Subjects
Advisory bodies
Congressional oversight
Economic performance and conditions
Federal Reserve System
Finance and financial sector
Government studies and investigations
Inflation and prices
Monetary policy
Congressional oversight
Economic performance and conditions
Federal Reserve System
Finance and financial sector
Government studies and investigations
Inflation and prices
Monetary policy