US HB2901 | 2017-2018 | 115th Congress

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on June 15 2017 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-04-18 - Pursuant to the provisions of H. Res. 831, H.R. 2901 is laid on the table.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Volunteer Income Tax Assistance Permanence Act of 2017 This bill directs the Internal Revenue Service (IRS) to establish a Community Volunteer Income Tax Assistance Matching Grant Program to provide matching funds for the development, expansion, or continuation of tax preparation programs to assist low-income taxpayers and members of underserved populations. Unless otherwise provided by a specific appropriation, the IRS may not allocate more than $30 million per fiscal year (exclusive of costs of administering the program) for the program.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Volunteer Income Tax Assistance Permanence Act of 2017

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-04-18HousePursuant to the provisions of H. Res. 831, H.R. 2901 is laid on the table.
2018-04-17HouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
2018-04-17HouseOn motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H3373-3374)
2018-04-17HouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 2901.
2018-04-17HouseConsidered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H3373-3375)
2018-04-17HouseMr. Curbelo (FL) moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended.
2018-04-11HouseOrdered to be Reported (Amended) by Voice Vote.
2018-04-11HouseCommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
2017-06-15HouseReferred to the House Committee on Ways and Means.
2017-06-15HouseIntroduced in House

Same As/Similar To

SB797 (Related) 2017-03-30 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
SB1 (Related) 2017-11-28 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 269.
HB5444 (Related) 2018-04-19 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
HR831 (Similar To) 2018-04-18 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
SB3278 (Related) 2018-10-03 - Committee on Small Business and Entrepreneurship. Hearings held.
HB6873 (Related) 2018-09-25 - Referred to the House Committee on Ways and Means.

Subjects


US Congress State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback