US HB2874 | 2011-2012 | 112th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 68-2)
Status: Introduced on September 8 2011 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-09-20 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on September 8 2011 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-09-20 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Abstinence Education Reallocation Act of 2011 - Authorizes the Administrator of the Health Resources and Services Administration (HRSA) to award grants for qualified sexual risk avoidance education to youth and their parents. Requires such education to meet certain criteria, including: (1) being age-appropriate, medically accurate, and evidence-based; (2) having as its sole purpose the teaching of the skills and benefits of sexual abstinence as the optimal sexual health behavior for youth; and (3) teaching the benefits of refraining from nonmarital sexual activity, the advantage of reserving sexual activity for marriage, and the foundational components of a healthy relationship. Gives priority to programs that serve youth ages 12 to 19 and that will promote the protective benefits of parent-child communication regarding healthy sexual decisionmaking.
Title
Abstinence Education Reallocation Act of 2011
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-09-20 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Health. |
2011-09-13 | House | Sponsor introductory remarks on measure. (CR H6105) |
2011-09-08 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Energy and Commerce. |
Same As/Similar To
SB2185 (Related) 2012-03-12 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions.
Subjects
Child health
Family planning and birth control
Health
Health programs administration and funding
Health promotion and preventive care
Marriage and family status
Sex and reproductive health
Sexually transmitted diseases
Teenage pregnancy
Family planning and birth control
Health
Health programs administration and funding
Health promotion and preventive care
Marriage and family status
Sex and reproductive health
Sexually transmitted diseases
Teenage pregnancy
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/112th-congress/house-bill/2874/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/112/bills/hr2874/BILLS-112hr2874ih.pdf |