US HB2857 | 2017-2018 | 115th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Engrossed on June 21 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-06-21 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on June 21 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-06-21 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Supporting Families in Substance Abuse Treatment Act (Sec. 2) This bill amends part E (Foster Care and Adoption Assistance) of title IV of the Social Security Act to provide that the removal and foster care placement of a child shall meet the requirements for foster care maintenance payments on the child's behalf if the child has been placed with a parent residing in a licensed residential family-based treatment facility. Placement with such a parent shall meet these requirements only if: the placement recommendation is specified in the child's case plan before the placement; the treatment facility offers, as part of substance abuse treatment, parenting skills training, parent education, and individual and family counseling; and this training and counseling are delivered under an organizational structure and treatment framework that involves understanding, recognizing, and responding to the effects of all types of trauma, and in accordance with recognized principles of a trauma-informed approach and trauma-specific interventions, to address the consequences of trauma and facilitate healing. The bill specifies the amount the state may receive for a child placed with a parent who is in a licensed residential family-based treatment facility for substance abuse.
Title
Supporting Families in Substance Abuse Treatment Act
Sponsors
Rep. Kristi Noem [R-SD] | Rep. Judy Chu [D-CA] | Rep. Danny Davis [D-IL] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-06-21 | Senate | Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance. |
2017-06-20 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2017-06-20 | House | On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H4968-4969) |
2017-06-20 | House | Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H4968-4970) |
2017-06-20 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 2857. |
2017-06-20 | House | Mrs. Noem moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended. |
2017-06-12 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Human Resources. |
2017-06-08 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Ways and Means. |
2017-06-08 | House | Introduced in House |
Subjects
Adoption and foster care
Child safety and welfare
Drug, alcohol, tobacco use
Families
Family relationships
Poverty and welfare assistance
Child safety and welfare
Drug, alcohol, tobacco use
Families
Family relationships
Poverty and welfare assistance