US HB2855 | 2015-2016 | 114th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 15-0)
Status: Introduced on June 23 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-08-13 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Military Personnel.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Military Personnel Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on June 23 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-08-13 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Military Personnel.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Military Personnel Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Veterans Education Flexibility Act Declares that, if an individual eligible for educational assistance under the all-volunteer force educational assistance program of the Department of Veterans Affairs is enrolled in an educational institution and the period of entitlement (ten years after discharge or release from active duty) would expire during a quarter or semester of enrollment, that period shall be extended to the end of that quarter or semester. Allows such an extension until the earlier of the end of the course or 12 weeks, in the case of an educational institution not regularly operated on a quarter or semester basis. Repeals the delimiting period for the use of assistance under the post-Vietnam era veterans' educational assistance program (generally 10 years after the veteran's last discharge or release from active duty). Applies the assistance extension provided under the all-volunteer force educational assistance program to the post-9/11 veterans' educational assistance program.
Title
Veterans Education Flexibility Act
Sponsors
Rep. Brian Higgins [D-NY] | Rep. Mark Takano [D-CA] | Rep. Chellie Pingree [D-ME] | Rep. Alan Lowenthal [D-CA] |
Rep. Michael Honda [D-CA] | Rep. John Garamendi [D-CA] | Rep. Steve Cohen [D-TN] | Rep. Madeleine Bordallo [D-GU] |
Rep. Derek Kilmer [D-WA] | Rep. Bonnie Coleman [D-NJ] | Rep. Judy Chu [D-CA] | Rep. James McGovern [D-MA] |
Rep. Eric Swalwell [D-CA] | Rep. Betty McCollum [D-MN] | Rep. Grace Meng [D-NY] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-08-13 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Military Personnel. |
2015-07-15 | House | Sponsor introductory remarks on measure. (CR H5185) |
2015-07-02 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Economic Opportunity. |
2015-06-23 | House | Referred to House Armed Services |
2015-06-23 | House | Referred to House Veterans' Affairs |
2015-06-23 | House | Referred to the Committee on Veterans' Affairs, and in addition to the Committee on Armed Services, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2015-06-23 | House | Introduced in House |
Subjects
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/114th-congress/house-bill/2855/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/114/bills/hr2855/BILLS-114hr2855ih.pdf |