US HB2855 | 2011-2012 | 112th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Introduced on September 7 2011 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-09-07 - Referred to House Ways and Means
Pending: House Ways And Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on September 7 2011 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-09-07 - Referred to House Ways and Means
Pending: House Ways And Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Emergency Jobs Now Act - Amends the Budget Control Act of 2011 to rename the Joint Select Committee on Deficit Reduction as the Joint Select Committee on Emergency Job Creation and Deficit Reduction. Requires the Joint Committee to recommend legislative language to: (1) enact emergency jobs legislation that will create an additional three million jobs during each of calendar years 2012 and 2013, thereby reducing unemployment rates over the short-term and long-term; and (2) reduce the deficit by at least $1.5 trillion over FY2014-FY2021, as under current law. Prescribes legislative procedures for expedited consideration in both chambers of the Joint Committee's recommendations. Amends the Balanced Budget and Emergency Deficit Control Act of 1985 (Gramm-Rudman-Hollings Act) to repeal the discretionary spending limits (spending caps) on new budget authority for security and nonsecurity categories for FY2012-FY2013, including those for: (1) continuing disability reviews and redeterminations under the Social Security Act, (2) the health care fraud abuse control program at the Department of Health and Human Services (HHS), and (3) disaster relief funding. Amends the Budget Control Act of 2011 to increase the public debt limit by an amount equal to the new budget authority provided in any emergency jobs legislation approved by the Joint Committee and enacted into law.
Title
Emergency Jobs Now Act
Sponsors
Rep. Keith Ellison [D-MN] | Rep. Yvette Clarke [D-NY] | Rep. Marcia Fudge [D-OH] | Rep. Raul Grijalva [D-AZ] |
Rep. Alcee Hastings [D-FL] | Rep. Barbara Lee [D-CA] | Rep. Gwen Moore [D-WI] | Rep. Jose Serrano [D-NY] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-09-07 | House | Referred to House Ways and Means |
2011-09-07 | House | Referred to House Budget |
2011-09-07 | House | Referred to House Rules |
2011-09-07 | House | Referred to the Committee on Rules, and in addition to the Committees on the Budget, and Ways and Means, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
Same As/Similar To
SB365 (Related) 2011-08-02 - Became Public Law No: 112-25.
SB627 (Related) 2011-08-01 - S.AMDT.593 Considered by Senate. (consideration: CR S5156)
SB1522 (Related) 2011-09-07 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Rules and Administration.
HB2835 (Related) 2011-09-06 - Referred to the House Committee on Rules.
SB627 (Related) 2011-08-01 - S.AMDT.593 Considered by Senate. (consideration: CR S5156)
SB1522 (Related) 2011-09-07 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Rules and Administration.
HB2835 (Related) 2011-09-06 - Referred to the House Committee on Rules.
Subjects
Budget deficits and national debt
Congress
Congressional committees
Congressional operations and organization
Employment and training programs
Legislative rules and procedure
Unemployment
Congress
Congressional committees
Congressional operations and organization
Employment and training programs
Legislative rules and procedure
Unemployment
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/112th-congress/house-bill/2855/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/112/bills/hr2855/BILLS-112hr2855ih.pdf |