US HB285 | 2015-2016 | 114th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 40-12-1)
Status: Engrossed on January 28 2015 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-02-04 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary.
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on January 28 2015 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-02-04 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary.
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
SAVE Act of 2015 Stop Advertising Victims of Exploitation Act of 2015 (Sec. 2) Amends the federal criminal code to prohibit knowingly: (1) advertising commercial sex acts involving a minor or an individual engaged in such an act through force, fraud, or coercion; or (2) benefitting financially or otherwise from such advertising knowing that the individual involved was a minor or victim of force, fraud, or coercion.
Title
SAVE Act of 2015 Stop Advertising Victims of Exploitation Act of 2015
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-02-04 | Senate | Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary. |
2015-01-28 | Senate | Received in the Senate. |
2015-01-27 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2015-01-27 | House | On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H596) |
2015-01-27 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 285. |
2015-01-27 | House | Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H596-600) |
2015-01-27 | House | Mr. Sensenbrenner moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill. |
2015-01-27 | House | Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 4. |
2015-01-27 | House | Reported by the Committee on Judiciary. H. Rept. 114-8. |
2015-01-21 | House | Ordered to be Reported by Voice Vote. |
2015-01-21 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2015-01-20 | House | Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, Homeland Security, and Investigations Discharged. |
2015-01-13 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, Homeland Security, and Investigations. |
2015-01-12 | House | Referred to the House Committee on the Judiciary. |
2015-01-12 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SB572 (Same As) 2015-02-25 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary.
Subjects
Crime and law enforcement
Crimes against children
Criminal investigation, prosecution, interrogation
Human trafficking
Marketing and advertising
Sex offenses
Crimes against children
Criminal investigation, prosecution, interrogation
Human trafficking
Marketing and advertising
Sex offenses