US HB2843 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 42-0)
Status: Introduced on May 20 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-06-26 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, and Homeland Security.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, and Homeland Security Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on May 20 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-06-26 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, and Homeland Security.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, and Homeland Security Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Decriminalizes marijuana. Specifically, it removes marijuana from the list of scheduled substances under the Controlled Substances Act and eliminates criminal penalties for an individual who imports, exports, manufactures, distributes, or possesses with intent to distribute marijuana. Additionally, the bill does the following: establishes a trust fund to assist women-owned and minority-owned marijuana businesses, requires federal research on the impacts of marijuana use on highway safety and public health, authorizes federal restrictions on the marketing of marijuana-related products, and authorizes grants for state and local governments to expunge or seal convictions for marijuana possession.
Title
Marijuana Freedom and Opportunity Act
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-26 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, and Homeland Security. |
2019-06-10 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Conservation and Forestry. |
2019-06-07 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on National Parks, Forests, and Public Lands. |
2019-05-21 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Highways and Transit. |
2019-05-21 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Health. |
2019-05-20 | House | Referred to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, and in addition to the Committees on the Judiciary, Natural Resources, Agriculture, Transportation and Infrastructure, and Small Business, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2019-05-20 | House | Referred to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, and in addition to the Committees on the Judiciary, Natural Resources, Agriculture, Transportation and Infrastructure, and Small Business, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2019-05-20 | House | Referred to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, and in addition to the Committees on the Judiciary, Natural Resources, Agriculture, Transportation and Infrastructure, and Small Business, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2019-05-20 | House | Referred to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, and in addition to the Committees on the Judiciary, Natural Resources, Agriculture, Transportation and Infrastructure, and Small Business, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2019-05-20 | House | Referred to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, and in addition to the Committees on the Judiciary, Natural Resources, Agriculture, Transportation and Infrastructure, and Small Business, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2019-05-20 | House | Referred to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, and in addition to the Committees on the Judiciary, Natural Resources, Agriculture, Transportation and Infrastructure, and Small Business, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2019-05-20 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SB1552 (Related) 2019-05-20 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary. (text: CR S2971-2972)
Subjects
Child safety and welfare
Crime and law enforcement
Criminal justice information and records
Criminal procedure and sentencing
Drug trafficking and controlled substances
Forests, forestry, trees
Government trust funds
Law enforcement administration and funding
Marketing and advertising
Medical research
Minority employment
Research administration and funding
Sales and excise taxes
Small business
Transportation safety and security
Women in business
Crime and law enforcement
Criminal justice information and records
Criminal procedure and sentencing
Drug trafficking and controlled substances
Forests, forestry, trees
Government trust funds
Law enforcement administration and funding
Marketing and advertising
Medical research
Minority employment
Research administration and funding
Sales and excise taxes
Small business
Transportation safety and security
Women in business
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/116th-congress/house-bill/2843/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/116/bills/hr2843/BILLS-116hr2843ih.pdf |