US HB284 | 2015-2016 | 114th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 46-18)
Status: Engrossed on March 17 2015 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-03-17 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 17 2015 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-03-17 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Medicare DMEPOS Competitive Bidding Improvement Act of 2015 Amends title XVIII (Medicare) of the Social Security Act with respect to the Medicare durable medical equipment, prosthetics, orthotics, and supplies (DMEPOS) competitive acquisition program. Prohibits an entity from submitting a bid for a competitive acquisition area, during calendar 2017-2019, unless it has obtained a bid surety bond of between $50,000 and $100,000 for each such area. Requires the forfeit of any bid bond submitted for a competitive acquisition area if the bidding entity does not accept a contract offered for any product category when its composite bid was at or below the median composite bid rate for all bidding entities included in the calculation of the single payment amounts for the product category and the area. Requires the Secretary of Health and Human Services to collect on the forfeited bond. Requires return of a bid bond within a specified 90-day period to a bidding entity that does not meet such bid forfeiture conditions. Prohibits the Secretary from awarding a contract to any entity that does not meet state licensure requirements. Directs the Government Accountability Office to study the effect of this bid surety bond requirement on the participation of small suppliers in the Medicare DMEPOS competitive acquisition program.
Title
Medicare DMEPOS Competitive Bidding Improvement Act of 2015
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-17 | Senate | Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance. |
2015-03-16 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2015-03-16 | House | On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H1646) |
2015-03-16 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 284. |
2015-03-16 | House | Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H1646-1647) |
2015-03-16 | House | Mr. Ryan (WI) moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended. |
2015-03-13 | House | Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Ways and Means. H. Rept. 114-38, Part I. |
2015-02-26 | House | Ordered to be Reported (Amended) by Voice Vote. |
2015-02-26 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2015-01-28 | House | Sponsor introductory remarks on measure. (CR E133) |
2015-01-16 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Health. |
2015-01-12 | House | Referred to House Ways and Means |
2015-01-12 | House | Referred to House Energy and Commerce |
2015-01-12 | House | Referred to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, and in addition to the Committee on Ways and Means, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2015-01-12 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SB148 (Same As) 2015-01-12 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
HB2 (Related) 2015-04-16 - Became Public Law No: 114-10. (TXT | PDF)
HB2 (Related) 2015-04-16 - Became Public Law No: 114-10. (TXT | PDF)
Subjects
Health
Health technology, devices, supplies
Licensing and registrations
Medicare
Public contracts and procurement
Health technology, devices, supplies
Licensing and registrations
Medicare
Public contracts and procurement