US HB2835 | 2015-2016 | 114th Congress
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 15-3-1)
Status: Passed on October 16 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-10-16 - Became Public Law No: 114-68. (TXT | PDF)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 15-3-1)
Status: Passed on October 16 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-10-16 - Became Public Law No: 114-68. (TXT | PDF)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Border Jobs for Veterans Act of 2015 (Sec. 3) Directs the Department of Homeland Security (DHS) to consider the expedited hiring of qualified candidates who have the ability to perform the essential functions of the position of a Customs and Border Protection (CBP) officer and who are eligible for a veterans recruitment appointment. (Sec. 4) Requires DHS to enhance DHS efforts to recruit members of the Armed Forces who are separating from military service to serve as CBP officers. Requires such enhanced recruiting efforts to: include CBP officer opportunities in relevant job assistance efforts under the Transition Assistance Program; place CBP officials or other relevant DHS officials at recruiting events and jobs fairs involving separating members of the Armed Forces; provide opportunities for local CBP field offices to partner with military bases in the region; include outreach efforts to educate members of the Armed Forces with qualifications that are transferable to CBP officer requirements; identify shared activities and opportunities for reciprocity related to steps in hiring CBP officers with the goal of minimizing the time required to hire qualified applicants; ensure the streamlined interagency transfer of relevant background investigations and security clearances; and include other elements to ensure that separating members of the Armed Forces are aware of opportunities to fill vacant CBP officer positions. (Sec. 5) Directs DHS to report to Congress on DHS efforts to hire members of the Armed Forces who are separating from military service as CBP officers.
Title
Border Jobs for Veterans Act of 2015
Sponsors
Sen. Martha McSally [R-AZ] | Rep. Dina Titus [D-NV] | Rep. Will Hurd [R-TX] | Rep. Ruben Gallego [D-AZ] |
Rep. Elise Stefanik [R-NY] | Rep. Paul Gosar [R-AZ] | Rep. Ryan Zinke [R-MT] | Sen. Kyrsten Sinema [I-AZ] |
Rep. Daniel Donovan [R-NY] | Rep. Stephen Knight [R-CA] | Rep. Barbara Comstock [R-VA] | Rep. Candice Miller [R-MI] |
Rep. Peter King [R-NY] | Rep. John Katko [R-NY] | Rep. Brad Ashford [D-NE] | Rep. Curt Clawson [R-FL] |
Rep. Pete Olson [R-TX] | Rep. Lou Barletta [R-PA] | Rep. Christopher Gibson [R-NY] |
Roll Calls
2015-09-28 - House - On Motion to Suspend the Rules and Pass, as Amended (Y: 410 N: 0 NV: 24 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-10-16 | Senate | Became Public Law No: 114-68. (TXT | PDF) |
2015-10-16 | Senate | Signed by President. |
2015-10-07 | Senate | Presented to President. |
2015-10-01 | Senate | Message on Senate action sent to the House. |
2015-10-01 | Senate | Passed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S7065-7067) |
2015-09-29 | Senate | Received in the Senate, read twice. |
2015-09-28 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2015-09-28 | House | On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 410 - 0 (Roll no. 519). (text: CR H6285) |
2015-09-28 | House | Considered as unfinished business. (consideration: CR H6290-6291) |
2015-09-28 | House | At the conclusion of debate, the Yeas and Nays were demanded and ordered. Pursuant to the provisions of clause 8, rule XX, the Chair announced that further proceedings on the motion would be postponed. |
2015-09-28 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 2835. |
2015-09-28 | House | Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H6285-6287) |
2015-09-28 | House | Ms. McSally moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended. |
2015-08-13 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Military Personnel. |
2015-06-29 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Oversight and Management Efficiency. |
2015-06-29 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Border and Maritime Security. |
2015-06-18 | House | Referred to House Armed Services |
2015-06-18 | House | Referred to House Homeland Security |
2015-06-18 | House | Referred to the Committee on Homeland Security, and in addition to the Committee on Armed Services, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2015-06-18 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SB1603 (Same As) 2015-09-21 - Message on House action received in Senate and at desk: House amendment to Senate bill.
Subjects
Border security and unlawful immigration
Congressional oversight
Department of Homeland Security
Emergency management
Employee hiring
Government employee pay, benefits, personnel management
Law enforcement officers
Military education and training
Veterans' education, employment, rehabilitation
Congressional oversight
Department of Homeland Security
Emergency management
Employee hiring
Government employee pay, benefits, personnel management
Law enforcement officers
Military education and training
Veterans' education, employment, rehabilitation