US HB2825 | 2021-2022 | 117th Congress

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on April 22 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-07-14 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Disability Assistance and Memorial Affairs.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Disability Assistance and Memorial Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Requires the Department of Veterans Affairs (VA) to establish and maintain the Fort McClellan Health Registry, which must include a list of names of those who were stationed at Fort McClellan, Alabama, between January 1, 1935, and May 20, 1999, and are seeking specified health care or benefits from the VA. Specifically, the registry must include those who apply for hospital, nursing home, domiciliary, or medical care from the VA; file a claim for compensation for service-connected disability; die and are survived by a spouse, child, or parent who files a claim for dependency and indemnity compensation; request a VA health examination; or receive a VA health examination and request to be included in the registry. The registry must also include relevant medical data of the listed individuals if they grant permission or are deceased at the time they are listed. Individuals who have submitted applications, requests, or claims prior to the enactment of this bill must be included in the registry to the extent feasible. The VA must periodically notify individuals listed in the registry of significant research developments on the health consequences of potential exposure to toxic substances or environmental hazards related to service at Fort McClellan. Additionally, the VA must reach out to individuals regarding the provision of health examinations and consultation and counseling services. In establishing and maintaining the registry, the VA must consult with the Department of Defense to acquire necessary information.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Fort McClellan Health Registry Act

Sponsors

Rep. Paul Tonko [D-NY]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-07-14HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Disability Assistance and Memorial Affairs.
2021-04-22HouseReferred to the House Committee on Veterans' Affairs.
2021-04-22HouseIntroduced in House

Same As/Similar To

HB3967 (Related) 2021-06-24 - Ordered to be Reported by the Yeas and Nays: 14 - 11.

Subjects


US Congress State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback