US HB2819 | 2021-2022 | 117th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on April 22 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-10-14 - Subcommittee Hearings Held.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on April 22 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-10-14 - Subcommittee Hearings Held.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
To amend title 38, United States Code, to improve and expand the Solid Start program of the Department of Veterans Affairs, and for other purposes.
Title
Solid Start Act of 2021
Sponsors
Rep. Elissa Slotkin [D-MI] | Rep. David Joyce [R-OH] | Rep. Christopher Pappas [D-NH] | Rep. Bill Posey [R-FL] |
Rep. Pete Aguilar [D-CA] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-10-14 | House | Subcommittee Hearings Held. |
2021-07-14 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Health. |
2021-04-22 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Veterans' Affairs. |
2021-04-22 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SB1198 (Same As) 2022-10-17 - Became Public Law No: 117-205.
HR1396 (Similar To) 2022-09-28 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
HR1396 (Similar To) 2022-09-28 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
Subjects
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/117th-congress/house-bill/2819/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/117/bills/hr2819/BILLS-117hr2819ih.pdf |