US HB2811 | 2021-2022 | 117th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 202-49)
Status: Introduced on April 22 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-06-16 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Water, Oceans, and Wildlife.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Water, Oceans, and Wildlife Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on April 22 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-06-16 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Water, Oceans, and Wildlife.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Water, Oceans, and Wildlife Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
To prohibit the sale of shark fins, and for other purposes.
Title
Shark Fin Sales Elimination Act of 2021
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-16 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Water, Oceans, and Wildlife. |
2021-04-22 | House | Referred to the Committee on Natural Resources, and in addition to the Committee on the Budget, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2021-04-22 | House | Sponsor introductory remarks on measure. (CR E446) |
2021-04-22 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SB1106 (Related) 2021-04-13 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation.
SB1260 (Related) 2021-06-08 - Passed Senate, under the order of 5/28/21, having achieved 60 votes in the affirmative, with an amendment by Yea-Nay Vote. 68 - 32. Record Vote Number: 226. (text: CR S4049-4499)
HB7776 (Related) 2022-12-23 - Became Public Law No: 117-263.
SB1260 (Related) 2021-06-08 - Passed Senate, under the order of 5/28/21, having achieved 60 votes in the affirmative, with an amendment by Yea-Nay Vote. 68 - 32. Record Vote Number: 226. (text: CR S4049-4499)
HB7776 (Related) 2022-12-23 - Became Public Law No: 117-263.
Subjects
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/117th-congress/house-bill/2811/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/117/bills/hr2811/BILLS-117hr2811ih.pdf |