US HB2793 | 2021-2022 | 117th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 22-2)
Status: Engrossed on April 27 2022 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-04-27 - Received in the Senate. Read twice. Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 352.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 27 2022 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-04-27 - Received in the Senate. Read twice. Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 352.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
To reauthorize the Highlands Conservation Act, to authorize States to use funds from that Act for administrative purposes, and for other purposes.
Title
Highlands Conservation Reauthorization Act of 2022
Sponsors
Rep. Sean Maloney [D-NY] | Rep. Madeleine Dean [D-PA] | Rep. Brian Fitzpatrick [R-PA] | Rep. Josh Gottheimer [D-NJ] |
Rep. Jahana Hayes [D-CT] | Rep. Chrissy Houlahan [D-PA] | Rep. Mondaire Jones [D-NY] | Rep. Tom Malinowski [D-NJ] |
Rep. Dan Meuser [R-PA] | Rep. Joseph Morelle [D-NY] | Rep. Jerrold Nadler [D-NY] | Rep. Donald Payne [D-NJ] |
Rep. Bill Pascrell [D-NJ] | Rep. Mary Gay Scanlon [D-PA] | Rep. Albio Sires [D-NJ] | Rep. Paul Tonko [D-NY] |
Rep. Nydia Velazquez [D-NY] | Rep. Bonnie Coleman [D-NJ] | Rep. Susan Wild [D-PA] | Rep. Antonio Delgado [D-NY] |
Rep. John Larson [D-CT] | Rep. Matthew Cartwright [D-PA] | Rep. Joe Courtney [D-CT] | Rep. James Himes [D-CT] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-27 | Senate | Received in the Senate. Read twice. Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 352. |
2022-04-26 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2022-04-26 | House | On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H4477-4478) |
2022-04-26 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 2793. |
2022-04-26 | House | Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H4477-4479) |
2022-04-26 | House | Mr. Grijalva moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended. |
2022-04-25 | House | Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 218. |
2022-04-25 | House | Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Natural Resources. H. Rept. 117-296. |
2022-01-19 | House | Ordered to be Reported (Amended) by Unanimous Consent. |
2022-01-19 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2021-07-29 | House | Subcommittee Hearings Held. |
2021-06-15 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Water, Oceans, and Wildlife. |
2021-04-22 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Natural Resources. |
2021-04-22 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SB753 (Same As) 2022-03-02 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 296.