US HB2770 | 2011-2012 | 112th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on August 1 2011 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-08-05 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on August 1 2011 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-08-05 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Medicare Cost Contract Extension Act of 2011 - Amends title XVIII (Medicare) of the Social Security Act to extend through December 31, 2015, the indefinite extendability or renewability of Medicare reasonable cost reimbursement contracts.
Title
Medicare Cost Contract Extension Act of 2011
Sponsors
Rep. Erik Paulsen [R-MN] | Rep. Rick Berg [R-ND] | Rep. Mike Coffman [R-CO] | Rep. Chip Cravaack [R-MN] |
Rep. Diana DeGette [D-CO] | Sen. Cory Gardner [R-CO] | Rep. Ron Kind [D-WI] | Rep. Betty McCollum [D-MN] |
Rep. Kristi Noem [R-SD] | Rep. Ed Perlmutter [D-CO] | Rep. Collin Peterson [D-MN] | Rep. Scott Tipton [R-CO] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-08-05 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Health. |
2011-08-05 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Health. |
2011-08-01 | House | Referred to House Energy and Commerce |
2011-08-01 | House | Referred to House Ways and Means |
2011-08-01 | House | Referred to the Committee on Ways and Means, and in addition to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
Same As/Similar To
SB1497 (Same As) 2011-08-02 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
Subjects
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/112th-congress/house-bill/2770/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/112/bills/hr2770/BILLS-112hr2770ih.pdf |