US HB277 | 2013-2014 | 113th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 15 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-12-01 - Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 474.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 15 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-12-01 - Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 474.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Revises the boundaries of the Sachuest Point Unit RI-04P, Easton Beach Unit RI-05P, Almy Pond Unit RI-06, Hazards Beach Unit RI-07 in the John H. Chafee Coastal Barrier Resources System in Rhode Island.
Title
To revise the boundaries of John H. Chafee Coastal Barrier Resources System Sachuest Point Unit RI-04P, Easton Beach Unit RI-05P, Almy Pond Unit RI-06, and Hazards Beach Unit RI-07 in Rhode Island.
Sponsors
Rep. David Cicilline [D-RI] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-12-01 | House | Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 474. |
2014-12-01 | House | Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Natural Resources. H. Rept. 113-634. |
2014-07-16 | House | Ordered to be Reported (Amended) by Unanimous Consent. |
2014-07-16 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2014-07-16 | House | Subcommittee on Fisheries, Wildlife, Oceans, and Insular Affairs Discharged. |
2014-04-08 | House | Subcommittee Hearings Held. |
2013-01-31 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Fisheries, Wildlife, Oceans, and Insular Affairs. |
2013-01-15 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Natural Resources. |
Same As/Similar To
HB4222 (Related) 2014-04-08 - Subcommittee Hearings Held.
SB2926 (Related) 2014-11-13 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Environment and Public Works.
SB2926 (Related) 2014-11-13 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Environment and Public Works.