US HB272 | 2015-2016 | 114th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 6-2)
Status: Introduced on January 12 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-07-22 - Forwarded by Subcommittee to Full Committee by Voice Vote .
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 12 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-07-22 - Forwarded by Subcommittee to Full Committee by Voice Vote .
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Medal of Honor Priority Care Act Increases, from third to first, the priority for enrollment in the Department of Veterans Affairs (VA) health care system given to medal of honor recipients, regardless of the date on which the medal is awarded. Makes medal of honor recipients eligible for VA: (1) hospital, nursing home, and domiciliary care; (2) extended care services for non-service-connected disabilities, without having to make a copayment for such services; and (3) medications, without having to make a copayment for such medications.
Title
Medal of Honor Priority Care Act
Sponsors
Rep. Tim Walberg [R-MI] | Rep. David Roe [R-TN] | Rep. Brett Guthrie [R-KY] | Rep. Paul Tonko [D-NY] |
Rep. Doug LaMalfa [R-CA] | Rep. Gerald Connolly [D-VA] | Rep. Joe Wilson [R-SC] | Sen. Marsha Blackburn [R-TN] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-07-22 | House | Forwarded by Subcommittee to Full Committee by Voice Vote . |
2015-07-22 | House | Subcommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2015-07-14 | House | Subcommittee Hearings Held. |
2015-02-06 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Health. |
2015-01-12 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Veterans' Affairs. |
2015-01-12 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
HB3016 (Related) 2016-02-10 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Veterans' Affairs.
SB2921 (Related) 2016-05-16 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 467.
SB2921 (Related) 2016-05-16 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 467.
Subjects
Armed forces and national security
Hospital care
Long-term, rehabilitative, and terminal care
Prescription drugs
Veterans' medical care
Veterans' organizations and recognition
Hospital care
Long-term, rehabilitative, and terminal care
Prescription drugs
Veterans' medical care
Veterans' organizations and recognition
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/114th-congress/house-bill/272/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/114/bills/hr272/BILLS-114hr272ih.pdf |