US HB2645 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 31-11)
Status: Introduced on May 9 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-09-11 - Subcommittee Hearings Held.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on May 9 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-09-11 - Subcommittee Hearings Held.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Increases from 7 to 14 the number of days that the Department of Veterans Affairs (VA) may furnish health care services, including post-delivery care, to the newborn child of a woman veteran who delivered the child in a VA facility or another facility pursuant to a VA contract for such services.
Title
Newborn Care Improvement Act of 2019
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-09-11 | House | Subcommittee Hearings Held. |
2019-05-29 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Health. |
2019-05-09 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Veterans' Affairs. |
2019-05-09 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SB835 (Same As) 2019-03-14 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Veterans' Affairs.
HB3224 (Related) 2019-11-13 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Veterans' Affairs.
HB3224 (Related) 2019-11-13 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Veterans' Affairs.
Subjects
Armed forces and national security
Child health
Congressional oversight
Veterans' medical care
Women's health
Child health
Congressional oversight
Veterans' medical care
Women's health
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/116th-congress/house-bill/2645/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/116/bills/hr2645/BILLS-116hr2645ih.pdf |