US HB2644 | 2017-2018 | 115th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 18-11)
Status: Introduced on May 24 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-06-06 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on May 24 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-06-06 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Chronic Kidney Disease Improvement in Research and Treatment Act of 2017
Title
Chronic Kidney Disease Improvement in Research and Treatment Act of 2017
Sponsors
Rep. Tom Marino [R-PA] | Rep. John Lewis [D-GA] | Rep. Peter Roskam [R-IL] | Rep. Timothy Walz [D-MN] |
Rep. Zoe Lofgren [D-CA] | Rep. James McGovern [D-MA] | Rep. Gregg Harper [R-MS] | Rep. Glenn Thompson [R-PA] |
Rep. Rodney Davis [R-IL] | Rep. Joyce Beatty [D-OH] | Rep. Sanford Bishop [D-GA] | Rep. Lou Barletta [R-PA] |
Rep. Matthew Cartwright [D-PA] | Rep. Derek Kilmer [D-WA] | Rep. Mark Pocan [D-WI] | Rep. Lynn Jenkins [R-KS] |
Rep. Alan Lowenthal [D-CA] | Rep. Donald Payne [D-NJ] | Rep. Earl Blumenauer [D-OR] | Rep. Chellie Pingree [D-ME] |
Rep. Don Bacon [R-NE] | Rep. Peter DeFazio [D-OR] | Rep. Jaime Herrera Beutler [R-WA] | Rep. Yvette Clarke [D-NY] |
Rep. Linda Sanchez [D-CA] | Rep. Blaine Luetkemeyer [R-MO] | Rep. David Valadao [R-CA] | Rep. Carol Shea-Porter [D-NH] |
Rep. Ted Lieu [D-CA] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-06-06 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Health. |
2017-05-26 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Health. |
2017-05-24 | House | Referred to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, and in addition to the Committee on Ways and Means, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2017-05-24 | House | Referred to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, and in addition to the Committee on Ways and Means, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2017-05-24 | House | Referred to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, and in addition to the Committee on Ways and Means, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2017-05-24 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SB1890 (Related) 2017-09-28 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance. (Sponsor introductory remarks on measure: CR S6225; text of measure as introduced: CR S6225-6227)
Subjects
Civil actions and liability
Congressional oversight
Digestive and metabolic diseases
Government studies and investigations
Health
Health care costs and insurance
Health care coverage and access
Health care quality
Health facilities and institutions
Health personnel
Health technology, devices, supplies
Home and outpatient care
Licensing and registrations
Medical education
Medical research
Medicare
Minority health
Organ and tissue donation and transplantation
Student aid and college costs
Congressional oversight
Digestive and metabolic diseases
Government studies and investigations
Health
Health care costs and insurance
Health care coverage and access
Health care quality
Health facilities and institutions
Health personnel
Health technology, devices, supplies
Home and outpatient care
Licensing and registrations
Medical education
Medical research
Medicare
Minority health
Organ and tissue donation and transplantation
Student aid and college costs
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/115th-congress/house-bill/2644/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/115/bills/hr2644/BILLS-115hr2644ih.pdf |