US HB264 | 2021-2022 | 117th Congress
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 6-1)
Status: Passed on August 6 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-08-06 - Became Public Law No: 117-34.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 6-1)
Status: Passed on August 6 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-08-06 - Became Public Law No: 117-34.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
To designate the facility of the United States Postal Service located at 1101 Charlotte Street in Georgetown, South Carolina, as the "Joseph Hayne Rainey Memorial Post Office Building".
Title
To designate the facility of the United States Postal Service located at 1101 Charlotte Street in Georgetown, South Carolina, as the "Joseph Hayne Rainey Memorial Post Office Building".
Sponsors
Rep. Tom Rice [R-SC] | Rep. James Clyburn [D-SC] | Rep. Nancy Mace [R-SC] | Rep. William Timmons [R-SC] |
Rep. Joe Wilson [R-SC] | Rep. Ralph Norman [R-SC] | Rep. Jeff Duncan [R-SC] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-08-06 | House | Became Public Law No: 117-34. |
2021-08-06 | House | Signed by President. |
2021-08-04 | House | Presented to President. |
2021-07-28 | Senate | Message on Senate action sent to the House. |
2021-07-27 | Senate | Passed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S5110; text: CR S5110) |
2021-04-14 | Senate | Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 37. |
2021-04-14 | Senate | Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs. Reported by Senator Peters without amendment. Without written report. |
2021-03-17 | Senate | Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs. Ordered to be reported without amendment favorably. |
2021-02-24 | Senate | Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs. |
2021-02-23 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2021-02-23 | House | On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H552) |
2021-02-23 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 264. |
2021-02-23 | House | Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H552-554) |
2021-02-23 | House | Mr. Mfume moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill. |
2021-02-12 | House | Ordered to be Reported by Unanimous Consent. |
2021-02-12 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2021-01-11 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Oversight and Reform. |
2021-01-11 | House | Introduced in House |