US HB263 | 2021-2022 | 117th Congress

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 206-52-1)
Status: Introduced on January 11 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2022-06-15 - Ordered to be Reported (Amended) by the Yeas and Nays: 25 - 17.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Revises requirements governing the trade of big cats (i.e., species of lion, tiger, leopard, cheetah, jaguar, or cougar or any hybrid of such species). Specifically, it revises restrictions on the possession and exhibition of big cats, including to restrict direct contact between the public and big cats.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Big Cat Public Safety Act

Sponsors

Rep. Mike Quigley [D-IL]Rep. Brian Fitzpatrick [R-PA]Rep. Earl Blumenauer [D-OR]Rep. Vern Buchanan [R-FL]
Rep. Jesus Garcia [D-IL]Rep. Michael Waltz [R-FL]Rep. Jerry McNerney [D-CA]Rep. Steve Womack [R-AR]
Rep. Sean Casten [D-IL]Rep. Adam Smith [D-WA]Rep. Chellie Pingree [D-ME]Rep. Suzanne Bonamici [D-OR]
Rep. Kathy Castor [D-FL]Rep. Julia Brownley [D-CA]Rep. Peter Welch [D-VT]Rep. James Langevin [D-RI]
Rep. C.A. Ruppersberger [D-MD]Rep. Alan Lowenthal [D-CA]Rep. Ken Buck [R-CO]Rep. Grace Napolitano [D-CA]
Rep. Grace Meng [D-NY]Rep. Eleanor Norton [D-DC]Rep. Bonnie Coleman [D-NJ]Rep. Brian Higgins [D-NY]
Rep. Jahana Hayes [D-CT]Rep. Mark Takano [D-CA]Rep. Lauren Underwood [D-IL]Rep. Chrissy Houlahan [D-PA]
Rep. Steven Horsford [D-NV]Rep. Alcee Hastings [D-FL]Rep. Val Demings [D-FL]Rep. Elaine Luria [D-VA]
Rep. Ruben Gallego [D-AZ]Rep. Daniel Kildee [D-MI]Rep. Nydia Velazquez [D-NY]Rep. Marc Veasey [D-TX]
Rep. Carolyn Maloney [D-NY]Rep. Ro Khanna [D-CA]Rep. Juan Vargas [D-CA]Rep. Betty McCollum [D-MN]
Rep. Anna Eshoo [D-CA]Rep. Thomas Suozzi [D-NY]Rep. Jimmy Panetta [D-CA]Rep. Derek Kilmer [D-WA]
Rep. Salud Carbajal [D-CA]Rep. Cindy Axne [D-IA]Rep. Mondaire Jones [D-NY]Rep. Lloyd Smucker [R-PA]
Rep. Diana DeGette [D-CO]Rep. Raul Ruiz [D-CA]Rep. Mike Garcia [R-CA]Rep. Guy Reschenthaler [R-PA]
Rep. Brendan Boyle [D-PA]Rep. Jason Crow [D-CO]Rep. Kurt Schrader [D-OR]Rep. Doris Matsui [D-CA]
Rep. Adam Schiff [D-CA]Rep. Judy Chu [D-CA]Rep. Dwight Evans [D-PA]Rep. Theodore Deutch [D-FL]
Rep. Jackie Speier [D-CA]Rep. Janice Schakowsky [D-IL]Rep. Frank Pallone [D-NJ]Rep. Susan Wild [D-PA]
Rep. Fred Upton [R-MI]Rep. Suzan DelBene [D-WA]Rep. Albio Sires [D-NJ]Rep. Andy Kim [D-NJ]
Rep. Paul Tonko [D-NY]Rep. Raja Krishnamoorthi [D-IL]Rep. Kathleen Rice [D-NY]Rep. Christopher Pappas [D-NH]
Rep. James McGovern [D-MA]Rep. Tom Malinowski [D-NJ]Rep. Ann Kuster [D-NH]Rep. Gregorio Sablan [I-MP]
Rep. Joyce Beatty [D-OH]Rep. David Cicilline [D-RI]Rep. Greg Stanton [D-AZ]Rep. Gregory Meeks [D-NY]
Rep. Norma Torres [D-CA]Rep. Joseph Neguse [D-CO]Rep. Mike Levin [D-CA]Rep. Ann Kirkpatrick [D-AZ]
Rep. Sean Maloney [D-NY]Rep. Lois Frankel [D-FL]Rep. Alma Adams [D-NC]Rep. Antonio Delgado [D-NY]
Rep. Peter DeFazio [D-OR]Rep. James Himes [D-CT]Rep. Pete Aguilar [D-CA]Rep. Ted Lieu [D-CA]
Rep. Pramila Jayapal [D-WA]Rep. Elizabeth Fletcher [D-TX]Rep. Ayanna Pressley [D-MA]Rep. Lee Zeldin [R-NY]
Rep. Michael Doyle [D-PA]Rep. Jim Cooper [D-TN]Rep. Abigail Spanberger [D-VA]Rep. John Yarmuth [D-KY]
Rep. Michael Turner [R-OH]Rep. Josh Harder [D-CA]Rep. Barbara Lee [D-CA]Rep. Gerald Connolly [D-VA]
Rep. Cheri Bustos [D-IL]Rep. Brad Sherman [D-CA]Rep. Tom O'Halleran [D-AZ]Rep. Andy Levin [D-MI]
Rep. Sylvia Garcia [D-TX]Rep. Ed Perlmutter [D-CO]Rep. Madeleine Dean [D-PA]Rep. Katherine Clark [D-MA]
Rep. Maria Salazar [R-FL]Rep. Luis Correa [D-CA]Rep. Marie Newman [D-IL]Rep. Mark Pocan [D-WI]
Rep. Bradley Schneider [D-IL]Rep. Colin Allred [D-TX]Rep. Lucy McBath [D-GA]Rep. Bill Johnson [R-OH]
Rep. Tim Ryan [D-OH]Rep. Mark DeSaulnier [D-CA]Rep. Michael McCaul [R-TX]Rep. Rodney Davis [R-IL]
Rep. Haley Stevens [D-MI]Rep. Jared Huffman [D-CA]Rep. Veronica Escobar [D-TX]Rep. Jeff Van Drew [R-NJ]
Rep. David Joyce [R-OH]Rep. Andrew Garbarino [R-NY]Rep. Rebecca Sherrill [D-NJ]Rep. Dina Titus [D-NV]
Rep. Matthew Cartwright [D-PA]Rep. Gus Bilirakis [R-FL]Rep. Josh Gottheimer [D-NJ]Rep. Lisa Rochester [D-DE]
Rep. Steve Cohen [D-TN]Rep. Diana Harshbarger [R-TN]Rep. Donald Norcross [D-NJ]Rep. David Schweikert [R-AZ]
Rep. Nancy Mace [R-SC]Rep. Earl Carter [R-GA]Rep. Adam Kinzinger [R-IL]Rep. Zoe Lofgren [D-CA]
Rep. Tim Burchett [R-TN]Rep. Sara Jacobs [D-CA]Rep. Al Lawson [D-FL]Rep. Claudia Tenney [R-NY]
Rep. Lance Gooden [R-TX]Rep. Barry Moore [R-AL]Rep. Nanette Barragan [D-CA]Rep. Seth Moulton [D-MA]
Rep. Nikema Williams [D-GA]Rep. Jerrold Nadler [D-NY]Rep. Joe Courtney [D-CT]Rep. Darin LaHood [R-IL]
Rep. Jamie Raskin [D-MD]Rep. Brenda Lawrence [D-MI]Rep. Teresa Fernandez [D-NM]Rep. Debbie Wasserman Schultz [D-FL]
Rep. Bill Foster [D-IL]Rep. Christopher Smith [R-NJ]Rep. Rick Larsen [D-WA]Rep. John Rutherford [R-FL]
Rep. Jake Auchincloss [D-MA]Rep. Charlie Crist [D-FL]Rep. Carolyn Bourdeaux [D-GA]Rep. Ed Case [D-HI]
Rep. Lisa McClain [R-MI]Rep. Kay Granger [R-TX]Rep. Eric Swalwell [D-CA]Rep. David Valadao [R-CA]
Rep. Mark Amodei [R-NV]Rep. Ron Kind [D-WI]Rep. Conor Lamb [D-PA]Rep. Steve Chabot [R-OH]
Rep. Anthony Brown [D-MD]Rep. Ritchie Torres [D-NY]Rep. John Larson [D-CT]Rep. Darren Soto [D-FL]
Rep. Marilyn Strickland [D-WA]Rep. David Trone [D-MD]Rep. Elise Stefanik [R-NY]Rep. Linda Sanchez [D-CA]
Rep. Danny Davis [D-IL]Rep. Don Beyer [D-VA]Rep. David Price [D-NC]Rep. Yvette Clarke [D-NY]
Rep. Stephanie Murphy [D-FL]Rep. Lori Trahan [D-MA]Rep. Kaialii Kahele [D-HI]Rep. Kim Schrier [D-WA]
Rep. Bobby Rush [D-IL]Rep. Sharice Davids [D-KS]Rep. Angela Craig [D-MN]Rep. Adriano Espaillat [D-NY]
Rep. Andre Carson [D-IN]Rep. Elissa Slotkin [D-MI]Rep. Melanie Stansbury [D-NM]Rep. Scott Peters [D-CA]
Rep. Michelle Steel [R-CA]Rep. French Hill [R-AR]Rep. Ralph Norman [R-SC]Rep. Karen Bass [D-CA]
Rep. Mary Gay Scanlon [D-PA]Rep. Dean Phillips [D-MN]Rep. Mike Bost [R-IL]Rep. Tom Reed [R-NY]
Rep. Troy Nehls [R-TX]Rep. Joaquin Castro [D-TX]Rep. David Scott [D-GA]Rep. John Sarbanes [D-MD]
Rep. Rosa DeLauro [D-CT]Rep. Ami Bera [D-CA]Rep. Richard Neal [D-MA]Rep. Katie Porter [D-CA]
Rep. Jennifer Wexton [D-VA]Rep. Lucille Roybal-Allard [D-CA]Rep. Frederica Wilson [D-FL]Rep. Young Kim [R-CA]
Rep. Carlos Gimenez [R-FL]Rep. G. Butterfield [D-NC]Rep. Sanford Bishop [D-GA]Rep. Henry Cuellar [D-TX]
Rep. Donald Payne [D-NJ]Rep. Al Green [D-TX]Rep. Stephen Lynch [D-MA]Rep. Deborah Ross [D-NC]
Rep. Debbie Dingell [D-MI]Rep. Ilhan Omar [D-MN]Rep. Robin Kelly [D-IL]Rep. Emanuel Cleaver [D-MO]
Rep. Joseph Morelle [D-NY]Rep. Don Bacon [R-NE]Rep. Donald McEachin [D-VA]Rep. Kathy Manning [D-NC]
Rep. Eddie Johnson [D-TX]Rep. Vicente Gonzalez [D-TX]Rep. Bill Pascrell [D-NJ]Rep. Henry Johnson [D-GA]
Rep. William Keating [D-MA]Rep. Robert Scott [D-VA]Rep. Suzanne Lee [D-NV]Rep. Tony Cardenas [D-CA]
Rep. Hakeem Jeffries [D-NY]Rep. Mike Thompson [D-CA]Rep. Nicole Malliotakis [R-NY]Rep. Frank Mrvan [D-IN]
Rep. Elizabeth Van Duyne [R-TX]Rep. Lloyd Doggett [D-TX]Rep. Pete Sessions [R-TX]Rep. Jim Costa [D-CA]
Rep. Scott Franklin [R-FL]Rep. Sheila Jackson-Lee [D-TX]Rep. Steven Palazzo [R-MS]Rep. Jimmy Gomez [D-CA]
Rep. Troy Balderson [R-OH]Rep. Troy Carter [D-LA]Rep. Sheila Cherfilus-McCormick [D-FL]

History

DateChamberAction
2022-06-15HouseOrdered to be Reported (Amended) by the Yeas and Nays: 25 - 17.
2022-06-15HouseCommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
2022-06-15HouseSubcommittee on Water, Oceans, and Wildlife Discharged.
2022-05-12HouseSubcommittee Hearings Held.
2021-02-18HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Water, Oceans, and Wildlife.
2021-01-11HouseReferred to the House Committee on Natural Resources.
2021-01-11HouseIntroduced in House

Same As/Similar To

HB211 (Related) 2021-02-18 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Water, Oceans, and Wildlife.
SB1210 (Related) 2021-04-19 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Environment and Public Works.

Subjects


US Congress State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback