US HB2615 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 25-14)
Status: Engrossed on July 16 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-07-16 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Foreign Relations.
Pending: Senate Foreign Relations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on July 16 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-07-16 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Foreign Relations.
Pending: Senate Foreign Relations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizes foreign assistance to El Salvador, Guatemala, and Honduras (the Northern Triangle), and requires the Department of State to devise strategies to address economic development, corruption, and other issues in those countries. It also requires reports on various related topics, including factors that drive migrants from those countries to the United States. A portion of the assistance authorized for the Northern Triangle shall be conditioned upon the receiving country taking various actions, including (1) informing its citizens of the dangers of the journey to the United States, (2) fighting human and drug trafficking, and (3) combatting corruption. The State Department shall devise strategies directed at the Northern Triangle region to (1) promote inclusive economic growth that addresses the underlying causes of poverty and inequality, (2) combat corruption, (3) strengthen democratic institutions and rule of law, and (4) improve security conditions through means such as the professionalization of security services. The State Department shall designate a Senior Rule of Law Advisor for the Northern Triangle. The State Department shall also devise a strategy to work with Mexico to strengthen its southern border. The President shall impose sanctions on foreign persons determined to be involved in a significant act of corruption in a Northern Triangle country. Individuals who engage in such corruption shall be subject to property-blocking sanctions and barred from entering the United States.
Title
United States-Northern Triangle Enhanced Engagement Act
Sponsors
Rep. Eliot Engel [D-NY] | Rep. Michael McCaul [R-TX] | Rep. Albio Sires [D-NJ] | Rep. Francis Rooney [R-FL] |
Rep. Norma Torres [D-CA] | Rep. Ann Wagner [R-MO] | Rep. Henry Cuellar [D-TX] | Rep. Adriano Espaillat [D-NY] |
Rep. David Trone [D-MD] | Rep. Brad Sherman [D-CA] | Rep. Joaquin Castro [D-TX] | Rep. Will Hurd [R-TX] |
Rep. Gil Cisneros [D-CA] | Rep. Joe Wilson [R-SC] | Rep. Don Beyer [D-VA] | Rep. Colin Allred [D-TX] |
Rep. David Cicilline [D-RI] | Rep. Adam Schiff [D-CA] | Rep. Steve Cohen [D-TN] | Rep. Jamie Raskin [D-MD] |
Rep. Harley Rouda [D-CA] | Rep. Donna Shalala [D-FL] | Rep. Abigail Spanberger [D-VA] | Rep. Derek Kilmer [D-WA] |
Rep. John Curtis [R-UT] | Rep. Ted Yoho [R-FL] | Rep. Xochitl Torres Small [D-NM] | Rep. Susan Brooks [R-IN] |
Rep. Brian Fitzpatrick [R-PA] | Rep. Steve Watkins [R-KS] | Rep. Dan Crenshaw [R-TX] | Rep. Eric Swalwell [D-CA] |
Rep. Veronica Escobar [D-TX] | Rep. Guy Reschenthaler [R-PA] | Rep. Adam Kinzinger [R-IL] | Rep. Michael Guest [R-MS] |
Rep. Frank Pallone [D-NJ] | Rep. Dean Phillips [D-MN] | Rep. David Price [D-NC] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-07-16 | Senate | Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Foreign Relations. |
2019-07-15 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2019-07-15 | House | On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H5780-5784) |
2019-07-15 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 2615. |
2019-07-15 | House | Considered under suspension of the rules. |
2019-07-15 | House | Mr. Engel moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended. (consideration: CR H5780-5786) |
2019-06-26 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Immigration and Citizenship. |
2019-05-22 | House | Committee Agreed to Seek Consideration Under Suspension of the Rules. |
2019-05-22 | House | Ordered to be Reported (Amended) by Voice Vote. |
2019-05-22 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2019-05-09 | House | Referred to the Committee on Foreign Affairs, and in addition to the Committee on the Judiciary, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2019-05-09 | House | Referred to the Committee on Foreign Affairs, and in addition to the Committee on the Judiciary, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2019-05-09 | House | Introduced in House |
Subjects
Asia
Belize
Central America
Child safety and welfare
China
Computers and information technology
Congressional oversight
Crime prevention
Crime victims
Crimes against children
Crimes against women
Criminal investigation, prosecution, interrogation
Department of State
Diplomacy, foreign officials, Americans abroad
Domestic violence and child abuse
Drug trafficking and controlled substances
Economic development
El Salvador
Elections, voting, political campaign regulation
Executive agency funding and structure
Financial crises and stabilization
Foreign aid and international relief
Government ethics and transparency, public corruption
Government information and archives
Government studies and investigations
Guatemala
Honduras
Human trafficking
Immigration status and procedures
Intergovernmental relations
International affairs
Juvenile crime and gang violence
Law enforcement officers
Mexico
Natural disasters
News media and reporting
Performance measurement
Poverty and welfare assistance
Refugees, asylum, displaced persons
Rule of law and government transparency
Russia
Sanctions
Tax administration and collection, taxpayers
Visas and passports
Belize
Central America
Child safety and welfare
China
Computers and information technology
Congressional oversight
Crime prevention
Crime victims
Crimes against children
Crimes against women
Criminal investigation, prosecution, interrogation
Department of State
Diplomacy, foreign officials, Americans abroad
Domestic violence and child abuse
Drug trafficking and controlled substances
Economic development
El Salvador
Elections, voting, political campaign regulation
Executive agency funding and structure
Financial crises and stabilization
Foreign aid and international relief
Government ethics and transparency, public corruption
Government information and archives
Government studies and investigations
Guatemala
Honduras
Human trafficking
Immigration status and procedures
Intergovernmental relations
International affairs
Juvenile crime and gang violence
Law enforcement officers
Mexico
Natural disasters
News media and reporting
Performance measurement
Poverty and welfare assistance
Refugees, asylum, displaced persons
Rule of law and government transparency
Russia
Sanctions
Tax administration and collection, taxpayers
Visas and passports