US HB2615 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 25-14)
Status: Engrossed on July 16 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-07-16 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Foreign Relations.
Pending: Senate Foreign Relations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

United States-Northern Triangle Enhanced Engagement Act

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

United States-Northern Triangle Enhanced Engagement Act

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-07-16SenateReceived in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Foreign Relations.
2019-07-15HouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
2019-07-15HouseOn motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H5780-5784)
2019-07-15HouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 2615.
2019-07-15HouseConsidered under suspension of the rules.
2019-07-15HouseMr. Engel moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended. (consideration: CR H5780-5786)
2019-06-26HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Immigration and Citizenship.
2019-05-22HouseCommittee Agreed to Seek Consideration Under Suspension of the Rules.
2019-05-22HouseOrdered to be Reported (Amended) by Voice Vote.
2019-05-22HouseCommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
2019-05-09HouseReferred to the Committee on Foreign Affairs, and in addition to the Committee on the Judiciary, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
2019-05-09HouseReferred to the Committee on Foreign Affairs, and in addition to the Committee on the Judiciary, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
2019-05-09HouseIntroduced in House

Subjects

Asia
Belize
Central America
Child safety and welfare
China
Computers and information technology
Congressional oversight
Crime prevention
Crime victims
Crimes against children
Crimes against women
Criminal investigation, prosecution, interrogation
Department of State
Diplomacy, foreign officials, Americans abroad
Domestic violence and child abuse
Drug trafficking and controlled substances
Economic development
El Salvador
Elections, voting, political campaign regulation
Executive agency funding and structure
Financial crises and stabilization
Foreign aid and international relief
Government ethics and transparency, public corruption
Government information and archives
Government studies and investigations
Guatemala
Honduras
Human trafficking
Immigration status and procedures
Intergovernmental relations
International affairs
Juvenile crime and gang violence
Law enforcement officers
Mexico
Natural disasters
News media and reporting
Performance measurement
Poverty and welfare assistance
Refugees, asylum, displaced persons
Rule of law and government transparency
Russia
Sanctions
Tax administration and collection, taxpayers
Visas and passports

US Congress State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback