US HB2610 | 2011-2012 | 112th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-2)
Status: Introduced on July 21 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-12-01 - Committee Hearings Held.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on July 21 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-12-01 - Committee Hearings Held.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Asset Forfeiture Fund Reform and Distribution Act of 2011 - Amends the Magnuson-Stevens Fishery Conservation and Management Act to require the Secretary of Commerce (Secretary) or the Secretary of the Treasury, after September 30, 2011, to use each of the sums received as fines, penalties, and forfeitures of property for violations of any provisions of such Act, or of any other fishery resource law enforced by the Secretary, to make a payment to: (1) the state in which the violation occurred, (2) the state in which the vessel involved in the violation is homeported if the violation did not occur in a state, or (3) the state most directly affected by a violation neither occurring in a state nor involving a vessel. (Current law authorizes using such sums for certain civil and criminal enforcement costs.) Directs states to use such amounts for specified research and monitoring activities. Sets forth transitional rules authorizing the Secretary to use such amounts received before October 1, 2011, to reimburse appropriate legal fees and costs, up to $200,000 per person, to specified persons the Secretary directed to receive a remittance of at least a portion of a fisheries enforcement penalty. Prohibits the Administrator of the National Oceanic and Atmospheric Administration (NOAA) from assigning specified rulemaking or adjudication proceedings to an individual who has served as an NOAA administrative law judge for at least a five-year period if such proceeding pertains to the same fishery management region to which the majority of such proceedings that the individual presided over within the period pertained.
Title
Asset Forfeiture Fund Reform and Distribution Act of 2011
Sponsors
Rep. Barney Frank [D-MA] | Rep. Joe Courtney [D-CT] | Rep. Frank Guinta [R-NH] | Rep. Walter Jones [R-NC] |
Rep. William Keating [D-MA] | Rep. Stephen Lynch [D-MA] | Sen. Edward Markey [D-MA] | Rep. James McGovern [D-MA] |
Rep. Mike McIntyre [D-NC] | Rep. Michael Michaud [D-ME] | Rep. Frank Pallone [D-NJ] | Rep. Chellie Pingree [D-ME] |
Rep. John Tierney [D-MA] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-12-01 | House | Committee Hearings Held. |
2011-07-21 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Natural Resources. |
Same As/Similar To
SB1304 (Related) 2011-06-29 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation.
Subjects
Administrative remedies
Department of Commerce
Economic performance and conditions
Government employee pay, benefits, personnel management
Government trust funds
Judges
Legal fees and court costs
Marine and coastal resources, fisheries
Public lands and natural resources
Department of Commerce
Economic performance and conditions
Government employee pay, benefits, personnel management
Government trust funds
Judges
Legal fees and court costs
Marine and coastal resources, fisheries
Public lands and natural resources
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/112th-congress/house-bill/2610/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/112/bills/hr2610/BILLS-112hr2610ih.pdf |