US HB261 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 4 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-05 - Referred to the Subcommittee on National Parks, Forests, and Public Lands.
Pending: House Subcommittee on National Parks, Forests, and Public Lands Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 4 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-05 - Referred to the Subcommittee on National Parks, Forests, and Public Lands.
Pending: House Subcommittee on National Parks, Forests, and Public Lands Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Allows the Department of the Interior to designate annually at least one city in a state or U.S. territory as an American World War II Heritage City in order to recognize, and ensure the continued preservation and importance of, the history of the involvement of the United States in World War II.
Title
To authorize the Secretary of the Interior to annually designate at least one city in the United States as an "American World War II Heritage City", and for other purposes.
Sponsors
Rep. David Rouzer [R-NC] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-05 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on National Parks, Forests, and Public Lands. |
2019-01-04 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Natural Resources. |
2019-01-04 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SB47 (Related) 2019-03-12 - Became Public Law No: 116-9. (TXT | PDF)
SB56 (Same As) 2019-01-08 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Energy and Natural Resources.
HCR21 (Similar To) 2019-02-28 - Message on Senate action sent to the House.
SB56 (Same As) 2019-01-08 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Energy and Natural Resources.
HCR21 (Similar To) 2019-02-28 - Message on Senate action sent to the House.
Subjects
Armed forces and national security
Conflicts and wars
Congressional tributes
Military history
Urban and suburban affairs and development
Veterans' organizations and recognition
Conflicts and wars
Congressional tributes
Military history
Urban and suburban affairs and development
Veterans' organizations and recognition
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/116th-congress/house-bill/261/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/116/bills/hr261/BILLS-116hr261ih.pdf |