US HB2593 | 2017-2018 | 115th Congress

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on May 23 2017 - 25% progression
Action: 2017-05-24 - Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Federal Maritime Commission Authorization Act of 2017

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Federal Maritime Commission Authorization Act of 2017

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2017-05-24HouseCommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
2017-05-24HouseOrdered to be Reported (Amended) by Voice Vote.
2017-05-24HouseSubcommittee on Coast Guard and Maritime Transportation Discharged.
2017-05-24HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Coast Guard and Maritime Transportation.
2017-05-23HouseReferred to the House Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure.
2017-05-23HouseIntroduced in House

Same As/Similar To

SB1119 (Related) 2017-05-15 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation.
HB5515 (Related) 2018-08-13 - Became Public Law No: 115-232.
HB234 (Related) 2017-01-04 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Coast Guard and Maritime Transportation.
HR1019 (Similar To) 2018-07-24 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.

Subjects


US Congress State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback