US HB259 | 2013-2014 | 113th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 40-0)
Status: Introduced on January 15 2013 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-01-15 - Referred to the House Committee on Ways and Means.
Pending: House Ways And Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 15 2013 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-01-15 - Referred to the House Committee on Ways and Means.
Pending: House Ways And Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Energy Freedom and Economic Prosperity Act - Amends the Internal Revenue Code to repeal: (1) the excise tax credits for alcohol fuel, biodiesel, and alternative fuel mixtures; (2) the tax credits for the purchase of alternative motor vehicles and new qualified plug-in electric drive motor vehicles; (3) the alternative fuel vehicle refueling property tax credit; (4) the income tax credits for alcohol, biodiesel, and renewable diesel used as fuel; (5) the enhanced oil recovery tax credit and the tax credit for producing oil and gas from marginal wells; (6) the tax credits for producing electricity from renewable resources and from advanced nuclear power facilities; (7) the tax credit for carbon dioxide sequestration; (8) the energy tax credit; and (9) the tax credits for investment in qualifying advanced coal projects and qualifying gasification projects. Directs the Secretary of the Treasury to prescribe a flat income tax rate for corporations, in lieu of the existing marginal tax rates, based upon the overall revenue savings from the repeal of energy tax expenditures by this Act.
Title
Energy Freedom and Economic Prosperity Act
Sponsors
Rep. Mike Pompeo [R-KS] | Rep. Justin Amash [R-MI] | Rep. Kerry Bentivolio [R-MI] | Rep. Jim Bridenstine [R-OK] |
Rep. Paul Broun [R-GA] | Rep. Michael Burgess [R-TX] | Rep. Jason Chaffetz [R-UT] | Rep. Ron DeSantis [R-FL] |
Rep. Scott DesJarlais [R-TN] | Rep. Jeff Duncan [R-SC] | Rep. John Fleming [R-LA] | Rep. Trent Franks [R-AZ] |
Rep. Louie Gohmert [R-TX] | Rep. Bob Goodlatte [R-VA] | Rep. Paul Gosar [R-AZ] | Rep. Trey Gowdy [R-SC] |
Rep. Tom Graves [R-GA] | Rep. Tim Huelskamp [R-KS] | Rep. Walter Jones [R-NC] | Rep. Jack Kingston [R-GA] |
Rep. Raul Labrador [R-ID] | Rep. Doug Lamborn [R-CO] | Rep. Kenny Marchant [R-TX] | Rep. Tom McClintock [R-CA] |
Rep. Mark Meadows [R-NC] | Rep. Jeff Miller [R-FL] | Rep. Mick Mulvaney [R-SC] | Rep. Richard Nugent [R-FL] |
Rep. Steven Palazzo [R-MS] | Rep. Scott Perry [R-PA] | Rep. Trey Radel [R-FL] | Rep. Reid Ribble [R-WI] |
Rep. Thomas Rooney [R-FL] | Rep. David Schweikert [R-AZ] | Rep. Steve Stockman [R-TX] | Rep. Marlin Stutzman [R-IN] |
Rep. Lynn Westmoreland [R-GA] | Rep. Ed Whitfield [R-KY] | Rep. Joe Wilson [R-SC] | Rep. Ted Yoho [R-FL] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-01-15 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Ways and Means. |
Same As/Similar To
HB1569 (Related) 2013-04-15 - Referred to the House Committee on Ways and Means.
HB3895 (Related) 2014-06-20 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Readiness.
SB2279 (Related) 2014-05-01 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
HB3895 (Related) 2014-06-20 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Readiness.
SB2279 (Related) 2014-05-01 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
Subjects
Air quality
Alternative and renewable resources
Climate change and greenhouse gases
Coal
Corporate finance and management
Electric power generation and transmission
Hybrid, electric, and advanced technology vehicles
Income tax credits
Income tax rates
Motor fuels
Nuclear power
Oil and gas
Sales and excise taxes
Taxation
Alternative and renewable resources
Climate change and greenhouse gases
Coal
Corporate finance and management
Electric power generation and transmission
Hybrid, electric, and advanced technology vehicles
Income tax credits
Income tax rates
Motor fuels
Nuclear power
Oil and gas
Sales and excise taxes
Taxation
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/113th-congress/house-bill/259/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/113/bills/hr259/BILLS-113hr259ih.pdf |