US HB2587 | 2017-2018 | 115th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 21-12)
Status: Introduced on May 22 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-06-16 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Military Personnel.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Military Personnel Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on May 22 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-06-16 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Military Personnel.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Military Personnel Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Medical Nutrition Equity Act of 2017 This bill provides for coverage, under Medicare, Medicaid, other specified federal health-care programs, and private health insurance, of foods and vitamins that are medically necessary for the management of certain digestive and metabolic disorders and conditions.
Title
Medical Nutrition Equity Act of 2017
Sponsors
Rep. John Delaney [D-MD] | Rep. Jaime Herrera Beutler [R-WA] | Rep. Michael Capuano [D-MA] | Rep. Stephen Lynch [D-MA] |
Sen. Marsha Blackburn [R-TN] | Rep. Tim Ryan [D-OH] | Rep. Darrell Issa [R-CA] | Rep. Nydia Velazquez [D-NY] |
Rep. Paul Tonko [D-NY] | Rep. Joyce Beatty [D-OH] | Rep. Derek Kilmer [D-WA] | Rep. Timothy Walz [D-MN] |
Rep. John Lewis [D-GA] | Rep. Walter Jones [R-NC] | Rep. Marcy Kaptur [D-OH] | Rep. Brian Higgins [D-NY] |
Rep. James Himes [D-CT] | Rep. Eliot Engel [D-NY] | Rep. Chellie Pingree [D-ME] | Rep. Donald Payne [D-NJ] |
Rep. C.A. Ruppersberger [D-MD] | Rep. Evan Jenkins [R-WV] | Rep. Brian Fitzpatrick [R-PA] | Rep. Ileana Ros-Lehtinen [R-FL] |
Rep. Tom Marino [R-PA] | Rep. Michael Simpson [R-ID] | Rep. Jamie Raskin [D-MD] | Rep. Tom Cole [R-OK] |
Rep. Sheila Jackson-Lee [D-TX] | Rep. Barbara Comstock [R-VA] | Rep. Joseph Kennedy [D-MA] | Rep. Carol Shea-Porter [D-NH] |
Rep. Scott Tipton [R-CO] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-06-16 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Military Personnel. |
2017-06-05 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Health. |
2017-05-26 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Health. |
2017-05-22 | House | Referred to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, and in addition to the Committees on Ways and Means, Armed Services, and Oversight and Government Reform, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2017-05-22 | House | Referred to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, and in addition to the Committees on Ways and Means, Armed Services, and Oversight and Government Reform, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2017-05-22 | House | Referred to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, and in addition to the Committees on Ways and Means, Armed Services, and Oversight and Government Reform, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2017-05-22 | House | Referred to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, and in addition to the Committees on Ways and Means, Armed Services, and Oversight and Government Reform, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2017-05-22 | House | Referred to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, and in addition to the Committees on Ways and Means, Armed Services, and Oversight and Government Reform, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2017-05-22 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SB1194 (Same As) 2017-05-22 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
Subjects
Allergies
Child health
Digestive and metabolic diseases
Government employee pay, benefits, personnel management
Health
Health care costs and insurance
Health care coverage and access
Hereditary and development disorders
Immunology and vaccination
Medicaid
Medicare
Nutrition and diet
Surgery and anesthesia
Child health
Digestive and metabolic diseases
Government employee pay, benefits, personnel management
Health
Health care costs and insurance
Health care coverage and access
Hereditary and development disorders
Immunology and vaccination
Medicaid
Medicare
Nutrition and diet
Surgery and anesthesia
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/115th-congress/house-bill/2587/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/115/bills/hr2587/BILLS-115hr2587ih.pdf |