US HB2570 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Introduced on May 8 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-09-26 - Forwarded by Subcommittee to Full Committee by Voice Vote .
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on May 8 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-09-26 - Forwarded by Subcommittee to Full Committee by Voice Vote .
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Creates a fee to provide support for the treatment of drinking water contaminated with certain perfluoroalkyl or polyfluoroalkyl substances, commonly referred to as PFAS. These substances are man-made and may have adverse human health effects. A variety of products contain the compounds, such as nonstick cookware or weatherproof clothing. The Environmental Protection Agency (EPA) must establish a fee for the manufacture of PFAS. Revenue generated from the fees must be made available for a grant program. Under the program, the EPA must make grants to pay for the removal of PFAS from drinking water systems and wastewater treatment works.
Title
PFAS User Fee Act of 2019
Sponsors
Rep. Harley Rouda [D-CA] | Rep. Ro Khanna [D-CA] | Sen. Ben Lujan [D-NM] | Rep. Debbie Dingell [D-MI] |
Rep. Janice Schakowsky [D-IL] | Rep. Jackie Speier [D-CA] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-09-26 | House | Forwarded by Subcommittee to Full Committee by Voice Vote . |
2019-09-26 | House | Subcommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2019-05-15 | House | Sponsor introductory remarks on measure. (CR H3798) |
2019-05-13 | House | Subcommittee Hearings Held. |
2019-05-09 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Water Resources and Environment. |
2019-05-08 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Environment and Climate Change. |
2019-05-08 | House | Referred to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, and in addition to the Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2019-05-08 | House | Referred to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, and in addition to the Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2019-05-08 | House | Introduced in House |
Subjects
Appropriations
Consumer affairs
Environmental protection
Environmental Protection Agency (EPA)
Environmental regulatory procedures
Executive agency funding and structure
Government trust funds
Hazardous wastes and toxic substances
Manufacturing
Pollution liability
Solid waste and recycling
User charges and fees
Water quality
Water resources funding
Water use and supply
Consumer affairs
Environmental protection
Environmental Protection Agency (EPA)
Environmental regulatory procedures
Executive agency funding and structure
Government trust funds
Hazardous wastes and toxic substances
Manufacturing
Pollution liability
Solid waste and recycling
User charges and fees
Water quality
Water resources funding
Water use and supply
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/116th-congress/house-bill/2570/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/116/bills/hr2570/BILLS-116hr2570ih.pdf |