US HB2568 | 2013-2014 | 113th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on June 27 2013 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-07-09 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Public Lands and Environmental Regulation.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Public Lands and Environmental Regulation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on June 27 2013 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-07-09 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Public Lands and Environmental Regulation.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Public Lands and Environmental Regulation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Essex National Heritage Area Reauthorization Act - Amends the Omnibus Parks and Public Lands Management Act of 1996 to: (1) extend the authority for the Secretary of the Interior to make grants or provide assistance respecting the Essex National Heritage Area until September 30, 2027, and (2) increase the total amount that may be appropriated for the Area under the Act to $20 million.
Title
Essex National Heritage Area Reauthorization Act
Sponsors
Rep. John Tierney [D-MA] | Rep. Niki Tsongas [D-MA] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-07-09 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Public Lands and Environmental Regulation. |
2013-06-27 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Natural Resources. |
Same As/Similar To
SB1186 (Same As) 2013-07-31 - Committee on Energy and Natural Resources Subcommittee on National Parks. Hearings held. With printed Hearing: S.Hrg. 113-93.
Subjects
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/113th-congress/house-bill/2568/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/113/bills/hr2568/BILLS-113hr2568ih.pdf |