US HB2565 | 2017-2018 | 115th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on May 19 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-07-14 - Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 156.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on May 19 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-07-14 - Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 156.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
To require the use of replacement cost value in determining the premium rates for flood insurance coverage under the National Flood Insurance Act, and for other purposes. (Sec. 1) This bill directs the Federal Emergency Management Agency (FEMA) to incorporate the replacement cost value of a structure insured under the National Flood Insurance Program of 1968 in its consideration of chargeable premium rates. FEMA must conduct a study regarding risk rating redesign utilizing replacement cost and report the findings to Congress.
Title
To require the use of replacement cost value in determining the premium rates for flood insurance coverage under the National Flood Insurance Act, and for other purposes.
Sponsors
Rep. Blaine Luetkemeyer [R-MO] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-07-14 | House | Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 156. |
2017-07-14 | House | Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Financial Services. H. Rept. 115-221. |
2017-06-21 | House | Ordered to be Reported (Amended) by the Yeas and Nays: 34 - 25. |
2017-06-21 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2017-05-19 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Financial Services. |
2017-05-19 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
HB2874 (Related) 2017-11-15 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Banking, Housing, and Urban Affairs.
Subjects
Congressional oversight
Disaster relief and insurance
Finance and financial sector
Floods and storm protection
Government studies and investigations
Insurance industry and regulation
Disaster relief and insurance
Finance and financial sector
Floods and storm protection
Government studies and investigations
Insurance industry and regulation