US HB256 | 2017-2018 | 115th Congress

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 18-0)
Status: Introduced on January 4 2017 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-04-25 - ASSUMING FIRST SPONSORSHIP - Mr. Hunter asked unanimous consent that he may hereafter be considered as the first sponsor of H.R. 256, a bill originally introduced by former Representative Farenthold, for purposes of adding cosponsors and requesting reprintings pursuant to clause 7 of rule XII. Agreed to without objection.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Protect Our Military Families' 2nd Amendment Rights Act This bill amends the federal criminal code to allow a licensed gun dealer, importer, or manufacturer to sell or ship a firearm to the spouse of a member of the U.S. Armed Forces on active duty. (Current law already allows a licensed dealer, importer, or manufacturer to sell a firearm to a member of the U.S. Armed Forces on active duty.) The bill also specifies that, for purposes of federal firearms laws, a member of the U.S. Armed Forces on active duty, or his or her spouse, is a resident of the state in which: (1) the member or spouse maintains legal residence, (2) the permanent duty station of the member is located, and (3) the member maintains a home from which he or she commutes to the permanent duty station.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Protect Our Military Families' 2nd Amendment Rights Act

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-04-25HouseASSUMING FIRST SPONSORSHIP - Mr. Hunter asked unanimous consent that he may hereafter be considered as the first sponsor of H.R. 256, a bill originally introduced by former Representative Farenthold, for purposes of adding cosponsors and requesting reprintings pursuant to clause 7 of rule XII. Agreed to without objection.
2017-01-12HouseSponsor introductory remarks on measure. (CR H396)
2017-01-10HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, Homeland Security, and Investigations.
2017-01-04HouseReferred to the House Committee on the Judiciary.
2017-01-04HouseIntroduced in House

Same As/Similar To

SB394 (Same As) 2017-02-15 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Armed Services.
HB5515 (Related) 2018-07-11 - Message on Senate action sent to the House.

Subjects


US Congress State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback