US HB255 | 2013-2014 | 113th Congress
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 25 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-07-25 - Became Public Law No: 113-129.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 25 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-07-25 - Became Public Law No: 113-129.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Amends the Provo River Project Transfer Act to modify the definition of: (1) "Pleasant Grove Property" to mean a specified parcel of land in Utah acquired by the United States for the Provo River Project, Deer Creek Division, as in existence on the date on which the parcel is conveyed under such Act; and (2) "Provo Reservoir Canal" to mean the water conveyance facility historically known as the Provo Reservoir Canal and associated bridges, fixtures, structures, facilities, lands, interests in land, and rights-of-way held, acquired, constructed, or improved by the United States as part of such Project, extending from, and including, the Murdock Diversion Dam and forebay at the mouth of Provo Canyon, including the Provo Reservoir Canal Siphon and Penstock near the Jordan Narrows to the point where water is discharged to the Welby-Jacob Canal and the Utah Lake Distributing Canal, as in existence on the date on which the Provo Reservoir Canal is conveyed under such Act.
Title
To amend certain definitions contained in the Provo River Project Transfer Act for purposes of clarifying certain property descriptions, and for other purposes.
Sponsors
Rep. Jason Chaffetz [R-UT] |
Roll Calls
2013-12-03 - House - On Motion to Suspend the Rules and Pass (Y: 406 N: 0 NV: 25 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-07-25 | Senate | Became Public Law No: 113-129. |
2014-07-25 | Senate | Signed by President. |
2014-07-15 | Senate | Presented to President. |
2014-07-10 | Senate | Message on Senate action sent to the House. |
2014-07-09 | Senate | Passed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S4355-4364; text as passed Senate: CR S4355) |
2013-12-09 | Senate | Received in the Senate. Read twice. Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 256. |
2013-12-03 | House | On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 406 - 0 (Roll no. 615). (text: CR H7419) |
2013-12-03 | House | Considered as unfinished business. (consideration: CR H7426-7427) |
2013-12-03 | House | At the conclusion of debate, the Yeas and Nays were demanded and ordered. Pursuant to the provisions of clause 8, rule XX, the Chair announced that further proceedings on the motion would be postponed. |
2013-12-03 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 255. |
2013-12-03 | House | Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H7419-7420) |
2013-12-03 | House | Mr. McClintock moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill. |
2013-09-10 | House | Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 147. |
2013-09-10 | House | Reported by the Committee on Natural Resources. H. Rept. 113-200. |
2013-07-31 | House | Ordered to be Reported by Unanimous Consent. |
2013-07-31 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2013-07-31 | House | Subcommittee on Water and Power Discharged. |
2013-05-23 | House | Subcommittee Hearings Held. |
2013-01-31 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Water and Power. |
2013-01-15 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Natural Resources. |
Same As/Similar To
SB211 (Same As) 2013-06-27 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 106.